Cruz-Arce et al v. Management Administration Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Heriberto Vigo-Cruz and Chiany Cruz-Arce
Defendant: Leanette Vlez and Management Administration Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01488
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Management Administration Corporation served on 8/28/2018, answer due 9/18/2018. (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Leanette Vlez served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6044211.) re #1 Complaint, filed by Chiany Cruz-Arce, Heriberto Vigo-Cruz, filed by Chiany Cruz-Arce, Heriberto Vigo-Cruz. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Chiany Cruz-Arce, Heriberto Vigo-Cruz.(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
August 22, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Management Administration Corporation, Leanette Velez. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Having reviewed plaintiffs' affidavit in support of their request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 3-3), the request is denied. Plaintiffs, however, are authorized to pay the filing fee in 8 monthly installments of $50.00, due the first Friday of every month, beginning on September 7, 2018. Failure to comply with the payments may result in the dismissal of the case. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2018. (LMR)
August 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/27/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Sworn Statement)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Chiany Cruz-Arce, Heriberto Vigo-Cruz. Service due by 10/15/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Affidavit, #4 Summons Ms. Vlez, #5 Summons MAS Corp.)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz-Arce et al v. Management Administration Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanette Vlez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Management Administration Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heriberto Vigo-Cruz
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chiany Cruz-Arce
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?