Bella International LLC v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Bella International LLC
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01496
Filed: July 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Jury Trial set for 1/20/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Discovery due by 7/29/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 9/5/2018.(grf)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline August 27, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/24/2018. (brc)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to Appear: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/24/2018. (brc)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company Responses due by 8/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Jeannette M. Lopez on behalf of Bella International LLC Responses due by 8/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Jeannette)
July 20, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Francisco A. Besosa (ad)
July 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number SJ2018CV03465. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-5965937), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Del Cueto-Perez, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bella International LLC v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Enrique A. Del Cueto-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bella International LLC
Represented By: Hector F. Oliveras-Delgado
Represented By: Jeannette M. Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?