Maldonado Irrizary et al v. Amerijet International, Inc.
Plaintiff: Etienne Maldonado Irrizary, Marco Tulio Maldonado Santiago, Marco Tulio Maldonado-Santiago and Etienne Maldonado-Irrizary
Defendant: Amerijet International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01529
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Filing 8 JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/09/2018. (brc)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Stipulation of Dismissal: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. No costs, interest or attorneys' fees imposed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/09/2018. (brc)
August 9, 2018 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Amerijet International, Inc.. (Oliver-Fraticelli, Luis)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal: NOTED. No later than August 20, 2018, Mr. Maldonado-Rodriguez will inform plaintiffs that he is not admitted to practice before this Court and that they should retain counsel who is admitted to practice before this Court. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/07/2018. (brc)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Motion for Extension of Time: GRANTED. Answer deadline September 4, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/07/2018. (brc)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time until September 4, 2018 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli on behalf of Amerijet International, Inc. Responses due by 8/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Oliver-Fraticelli, Luis)
July 31, 2018 Filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt number 0104-5981088 (arg)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Court of First Instance, Carolina Superior Part, case number CA2018CV01353 (406). (), filed by Amerijet International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Oliver-Fraticelli, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado Irrizary et al v. Amerijet International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etienne Maldonado Irrizary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Tulio Maldonado Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marco Tulio Maldonado-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Etienne Maldonado-Irrizary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerijet International, Inc.
Represented By: Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?