Ortiz v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Edgar Ortiz
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01545
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: Adjuntas
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 Motion to allow Joshua Bachrach to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6079031) filed by Luis N. Saldana-Roman on behalf of Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company Responses due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Saldana-Roman, Luis)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/14/2018. (wm)
August 9, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edgar Ortiz upon Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 8/9/2018, answer due 8/30/2018. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Motion to allow J. Anthony Vessel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5990088) filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Edgar Ortiz Responses due by 8/17/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5989844.), filed by Edgar Ortiz. Service due by 11/1/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgar Ortiz
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Represented By: J. Anthony Vessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?