Vazquez-Cordero et al v. Municipality of Cayey et al
Plaintiff: Awilda Cordero-Gonzlez, Madeline Vazquez-Cordero, Alexander Vazquez-Cordero, Hctor L Vzquez-Cordero, Sr., Hector Vaquez-Cordero, Jr., Arleen Vazquez-Cordero and Sr. Hector L. Vazquez-Cordero
Defendant: Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas, Lourdes Rosario-Lugo, Centro Medico de Salud Mariano Rivera Ramos and Municipality of Cayey
Case Number: 3:2018cv01549
Filed: August 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: Adjuntas
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2018 to File Answer to the Complaint filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Municipality of Cayey Responses due by 10/18/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
October 4, 2018 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Municipality of Cayey Responses due by 10/18/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel) Modified on 10/5/2018 to edit event type (rom).
September 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez filed by Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rolan-Ramirez, Maria)
September 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION requesting Order Medical Records and Utilization Record filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas Responses due by 10/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Mennonite Cayey, #2 Text of Proposed Order University Hospital, #3 Text of Proposed Order Cayey Municipal Hospital, #4 Text of Proposed Order MCS Advantage)(Vivas, Jose)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Municipality of Cayey served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (Rolan-Ramirez, Maria)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Defendant Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas.(Vivas, Jose)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Municipality of Cayey. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #6 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Granted. Clerk of Court shall issue the requested amended summons, as appended to plaintiffs' motion at ECF No. 6. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 9/13/2018. (wm)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer filed by Ricardo E. Jimenez-Rojas. Answer deadline due by 9/23/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/24/2018. (cm)
August 24, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 23, 2018 to File Answer filed by Jose H. Vivas on behalf of Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vivas, Jose)
August 15, 2018 Filing 7 ***RESTRICTED*** SUBPOENA Returned Executed on 8.9.2018 as to Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas, SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Rolan-Ramirez, Maria)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Municipality of Cayey filed by Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Rolan-Ramirez, Maria)
August 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance (Motion Joining Legal Representation of Plaintiffs) by Luis G. Martinez-Llorens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
August 9, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas, Municipality of Cayey, Lourdes Rosario-Lugo (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number PRX100057265) (arg)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE ELECTRONIC FILING as to 1 Municipality of Cayey, et.al., COMPLAINT, filed by Hector L. Vazquez-Cordero, Sr., et.al., re: non-payment of filing fees Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/9/2018. (arg)
August 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Arleen Vazquez-Cordero, Hector Vaquez-Cordero, Jr, Awilda Cordero-Gonzlez, Madeline Vazquez-Cordero, Hctor L Vzquez-Cordero, Sr, Alexander Vazquez-Cordero. Service due by 11/5/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Dr. Ricardo Jimenez Rojas, #4 Summons Dr. Lourdes R. Rosario Lugo, #5 Summons Municipality of Cayey)(Rolan-Ramirez, Maria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez-Cordero et al v. Municipality of Cayey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo E Jimenez-Rojas
Represented By: Jose H. Vivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lourdes Rosario-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centro Medico de Salud Mariano Rivera Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Cayey
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Awilda Cordero-Gonzlez
Represented By: Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madeline Vazquez-Cordero
Represented By: Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Vazquez-Cordero
Represented By: Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hctor L Vzquez-Cordero, Sr.
Represented By: Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hector Vaquez-Cordero, Jr.
Represented By: Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arleen Vazquez-Cordero
Represented By: Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sr. Hector L. Vazquez-Cordero
Represented By: Maria Del Mar Rolan-Ramirez
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?