Sanchez-Rosa et al v. Municipality of San Juan, et al.
Plaintiff: Minerva Sanchez Rosa, Edgardo Alicea, Moises Diaz Diaz, Moises Diaz-Diaz and Minerva Sanchez-Rosa
Defendant: Carmen Yulin Cruz, Municipality of San Juan and Jose Caldero
Case Number: 3:2018cv01558
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #39 Motion to Clarify: NOTED. Rule 6 makes this matter crystal clear. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/05/2018. (brc)
October 5, 2018 Filing 39 MOTION to Clarify (Re: Dockets No. 37 & 38) filed by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 10/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #37 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. Response to plaintiffs' Motions to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action due October 8, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/01/2018. (brc)
October 1, 2018 Filing 37 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until October 8, 2018 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motions to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action (Dockets No. 22 & 23) as to #22 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally filed by Minerva Sanchez-Rosa, Edgardo Alicea, Moises Diaz-Diaz, 35 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #23 Supplemental Motion re: #22 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally filed by Minerva Sanchez-Rosa, Edgardo Alicea, Moises Diaz-Diaz filed by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 10/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #22 , 35 , #23 ) (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle)
September 25, 2018 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of Defendants Jose Caldero, Municipality of San Juan, Carmen Yulin Cruz.(Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: GRANTED. Response to motion deadline October 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/24/2018. (brc)
September 24, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of All Defendants (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
September 21, 2018 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 1, 2018 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motions to Conditionally Certify a Collective Action (Dockets No. 22 & 23) filed by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Jose Caldero, Municipality of San Juan, Carmen Yulin Cruz Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #31 Motion Submitting: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/14/2018. (brc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION Submitting translatons re: 25 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Certification, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Certification)(Related document(s) 25 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re #26 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Default has not been entered. Defendants will answer the complaint no later than September 25, 2018. No extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/11/2018. (brc)
September 11, 2018 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #26 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 26, 2018 to File Answer to the Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Oppose to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment During the Period Specified by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Municipality of San Juan filed by All Plaintiffs. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit typo (mcm).
September 11, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor D. Candelario-Vega on behalf of Jose Caldero, Municipality of San Juan, Carmen Yulin Cruz (Candelario-Vega, Victor)
September 11, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Jose Caldero, Municipality of San Juan, Carmen Yulin Cruz (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle)
September 11, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 26, 2018 to File Answer to the Complaint or, in the Alternative, to Oppose to Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Judgment During the Period Specified by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re: #21 MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Plaintiffs, #1 Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs filed by Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez on behalf of Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/25/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #21 , #1 ) (Martinez-Velazquez, Giselle) Modified on 9/12/2018 to edit filers (mcm).
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents: GRANTED. Certified English translations shall be filed no later than September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/10/2018. (brc)
September 10, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 10, 2018 Filing 23 Supplemental Motion re: #22 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #22 ) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 7, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 7, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #18 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/24/2018. (brc)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #17 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/24/2018. (brc)
August 24, 2018 Filing 18 Motion to allow John Barton Goplerud to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6025573) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 24, 2018 Filing 17 Motion to allow Brandon Bohlman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6025567) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 23, 2018 Filing 16 Third NOTICE of Opt-Ins by All Plaintiffs (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 Amended NOTICE of Opt-Ins by All Plaintiffs re #11 Notice (Other) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 14, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Jose Caldero served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 14, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Carmen Yulin Cruz served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 14, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Municipality of San Juan served on 8/14/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 14, 2018 Filing 11 Second NOTICE of Opt In Plaintiffs by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Opt In Form, #2 Opt In Form, #3 Opt In Form, #4 Opt In Form, #5 Opt In Form) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Notice (Other): NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/10/2018. (brc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Consent of Filing by All Plaintiffs (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
August 10, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jose Caldero, Municipality of San Juan, Carmen Yulin Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Motion for Issuance of Summons: GRANTED. The Clerk will issue the summons. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/10/2018. (brc)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jose Caldero, Municipality of San Juan, Carmen Yulin Cruz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6000587.) re #1 Complaint, filed by Minerva Sanchez Rosa, Edgardo Alicea, Moises Diaz Diaz, filed by Minerva Sanchez Rosa. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Minerva Sanchez Rosa, Edgardo Alicea, Moises Diaz Diaz.(Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 8/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Municipality of San Juan, #2 Summons Carmen Yulin Cruz, #3 Summons)(Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Minerva Sanchez Rosa, Edgardo Alicea, Moises Diaz Diaz. Service due by 11/7/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Change of Address, #4 Exhibit Opt In Form, #5 Exhibit Opt In Form)(Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez-Rosa et al v. Municipality of San Juan, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Sanchez Rosa
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Alicea
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Brandon M. Bohlman
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Diaz Diaz
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moises Diaz-Diaz
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Brandon M. Bohlman
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minerva Sanchez-Rosa
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Brandon M. Bohlman
Represented By: J. Barton Goplerud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Yulin Cruz
Represented By: Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez
Represented By: Hector Benitez-Arraiza
Represented By: Victor D. Candelario-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of San Juan
Represented By: Hector Benitez-Arraiza
Represented By: Victor D. Candelario-Vega
Represented By: Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Caldero
Represented By: Giselle M. Martinez-Velazquez
Represented By: Hector Benitez-Arraiza
Represented By: Victor D. Candelario-Vega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?