Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico
Petitioner: Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority
Respondent: National Public Finance Guarantee Corp., Zurich American Insurance Company, Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc., Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc., Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors, The Bank of New York Mellon, Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E., Fidelity & Deposit Co. of Maryland and United States of America
Interested Party: Wilmington Trust, National Association, Assured Guaranty Corp., Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, Panagiota Manatakis, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp., Ad Hoc Group of General Obligation Bondholders, Bank of America Merrill Lynch and Ambac Assurance Corporation
Undetermined: Autonomous Municipality of San Juan and Adsuar Muniz Goyco Seda & Perez-Ochoa, PSC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01561
Filed: August 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Judith G Dein
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Filing 185 Amended INFORMATIVE Motion regarding STIPULATION RESOLVING THE OBJECTION OF THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS OF ALL TITLE III DEBTORS (OTHER THAN COFINA) TO THE APPROVAL APPLICATION filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
October 5, 2018 Filing 184 MOTION to Withdraw re: #179 MOTION to Quash filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #179 ) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
October 5, 2018 Filing 183 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Motion Hearing held on 10/5/2018. (Court Reporter Sonia Kitter) (mr)
October 5, 2018 Filing 182 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Stipulation Resolving the Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of the Title III Debtors (Other than COFINA) to the Approval Application filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER re #179 MOTION to Quash filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico. Responses due by 10/8/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). Replies due by 10/11/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2018 03:00 PM in USDC-MA (VTC in PR) before US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein.Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 10/03/2018.(ct)
October 3, 2018 Filing 180 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Case called for Motion Hearing on 10/3/2018. Motion Hearing re: #1 Application reset for 10/5/2018 10:00 AM in USDC-SDNY (VTC in PR) before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. (Court Reporter Sonia Kitter / Steven Griffin.) (ct)
October 2, 2018 Filing 179 MOTION to Quash filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript (partial))(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
October 2, 2018 Filing 178 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors re #172 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding / Informative Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Regarding October 3, 2018 Hearing (Despins, Luc)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER granting #176 Third Motion of GDB and AAFAF for Extension of the Deadline for Objections to Discovery Requests in Connection with Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico S.E.s Preliminary Objection to Qualifying Modification. The deadline to object to discovery requests in connection with Siemens' Preliminary Objection to Proposed Qualifying Modification is hereby extended until Tuesday, October 2, 2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 10/1/2018. (mr)
September 28, 2018 Filing 176 Third MOTION for extension of time until October 2, 2018 to DEADLINE TO OBJECT TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN CONNECTION WITH SIEMENS TRANSPORTATION PARTNERSHIP PUERTO RICO S.E. PRELIMINARY OBJECTION TO QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 28, 2018 Filing 175 STIPULATION re #22 Notice (Other), #15 Notice (Other), Stipulated Withdrawal of Notices of Reservation of Rights by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 28, 2018 Filing 174 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Attendance at the October 3, 2018 Hearing filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 28, 2018 Filing 173 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Informative Motion of Financial Oversight and Management Board Regarding Request to be Heard at the October 3, 201 Hearing. filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
September 28, 2018 Filing 172 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding / Informative Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Regarding October 3, 2018 Hearing filed by Luc A. Despins on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors Responses due by 10/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Despins, Luc)
September 27, 2018 Filing 171 OBJECTION : Reply to Omnibus Response of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to GDB/AAFAF's and Oversight Board's Standing Objections filed by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Re: #111 Objection to, filed by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico filed by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
September 27, 2018 Filing 170 Reply to the #131 Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Omnibus Response to GDB/AAFFAF's and Oversight Board's Standing Objections filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria) Modified on 9/28/2018 to terminate as motion and to add relationship to docket 131 (mr).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER RESOLVING #168 Second MOTION for extension of time until September 28, 2018 to OBJECT TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN CONNECTION WITH SIEMENS TRANSPORTATION PARTNERSHIP PUERTO RICO S.E. PRELIMINARY OBJECTION TO QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Objections to discovery requests re: #132 Objection due by 9/28/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 09/27/2018.(ct)
September 26, 2018 Filing 168 Second MOTION for extension of time until September 28, 2018 to OBJECT TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN CONNECTION WITH SIEMENS TRANSPORTATION PARTNERSHIP PUERTO RICO S.E. PRELIMINARY OBJECTION TO QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR ATTENDANCE, PARTICIPATION AND OBSERVATION OF THE OCTOBER 3, 2018 HEARING. Re #1 Application filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/26/2018.(ct)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER RESOLVING #165 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. to file FOR NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORP. AND ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORP. TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO TH filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Objections to #1 Application due by 9/28/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/26/2018.(ct)
September 25, 2018 Filing 165 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time until September 28, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. to file FOR NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORP. AND ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORP. TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER ALLOWING #163 MOTION for extension of time until September 26, 2018 to OBJECT TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN CONNECTION WITH SIEMENS TRANSPORTATION PUERTO RICO S.E. PRELIMINARY OBJECTION TO QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Objections to discovery requests in connection with #132 due by 9/26/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein on 09/25/2018.(ct)
September 24, 2018 Filing 163 MOTION for extension of time until September 26, 2018 to OBJECT TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS IN CONNECTION WITH SIEMENS TRANSPORTATION PUERTO RICO S.E. PRELIMINARY OBJECTION TO QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER resolving #161 Emergency MOTION for extension of time until September 25, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. to FOR NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORP. AND ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORP. TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE QUALIF filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Objections to #1 Application due by 9/25/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/24/2018.(ct)
September 21, 2018 Filing 161 Emergency MOTION for extension of time until September 25, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. to FOR NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORP. AND ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORP. TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Soler, Giselle) Modified on 9/24/2018 adding link to #1 application (ct).
September 21, 2018 Filing 160 OBJECTION to Proposed Modifying Qualification filed by Fidelity & Deposit Co. of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company filed by Fidelity & Deposit Co. of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) Modified on 9/24/2018 adding link to #1 application (ct).
September 21, 2018 Filing 159 OBJECTION to Proposed Qualifying Modification filed by Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc., Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc. filed by Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc., Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc.. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) Modified on 9/24/2018 adding link to #1 application. (ct).
September 20, 2018 Filing 158 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding REVISED PROPOSED ORDER TO APPROVE THE QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Revised Approval Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Blackline)(Lopez-Soler, Giselle) Modified on 9/24/2018 adding link to #1 application (ct).
September 20, 2018 Filing 157 STIPULATION re #21 Notice (Other), Stipulated Withdrawal of National Public Finance Guarantee Corporations Notice of Intention to Object to the Qualifying Modification for the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico with Respect to the SIB Funds by National Public Finance Guarantee Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
September 20, 2018 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT DECLARATION OF JANE SULLIVAN ON BEHALF OF EPIQ CORPORATE RESTRUCTURING CERTIFYING THE TABULATION OF VOTES CAST ON THE QUALIFYING MODIFICATION FOR GDB UNDER TITLE VI OF PROMESA by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 20, 2018 Filing 155 AFFIDAVIT SOLICITATION AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER RESOLVING #153 Second MOTION for extension of time until September 21, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. to FOR NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORP. AND ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORP. TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE QUALIFYI filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Related document: #1 MOTION requesting Order. Objections due by 9/21/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/18/2018.(ct)
September 18, 2018 Filing 153 Second MOTION for extension of time until September 21, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. to FOR NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORP. AND ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORP. TO FILE OBJECTIONS TO THE QUALIFYING MODIFICATION filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #150 Motion for Karol Denniston to Appear PHV on behalf of Bank of America Merrill Lynch. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/18/2018. (mr)
September 17, 2018 Filing 151 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding RELEASES UNDER ARTICLE 702 OF THE GDB RESTRUCTURING ACT filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 10/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 17, 2018 Filing 150 Motion to allow Karol Denniston to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRXI00057904) filed by Felix J. Montanez-Miranda on behalf of Bank of America Merrill Lynch Responses due by 10/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Montanez-Miranda, Felix)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER SETTING A SCHEDULE FOR THE COMMITTEE'S DERIVATIVE STANDING MOTION AND THE ADVERSARY COMPLAINT. Terminating #127 and #128 . Hearing on Derivative Standing Motion (DE 3881 in 17-BK-3283) and any motions to dismiss in 18-AP-101 is set for 10/3/2018 02:00 PM (AST) in US Southern District of New York (VTC - USDC Puerto Rico) before Judge LAURA TAYLOR SWAIN. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/17/2018.(ct)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER APPROVING PROCEDURES AND SETTING A SCHEDULE FOR APPROVAL OF THE QUALIFYING MODIFICATION FOR THE GOVERNMENT DEVELOPMENT BANK FOR PUERTO RICO. Related documents: #4 , #127 , #128 . Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2018 02:00 PM (AST) before Judge Laura Taylor Swain in USDC-NY (VTC in PR). Qualifying Modification Approval Hearing set for 11/6/2018 10:00 AM (AST) before Judge Laura Taylor Swain in USDC-NY (VTC in PR). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Hearing Notice)(ct) Modified on 10/3/2018 to add hrg. (ct).
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER GRANTING #135 MOTION for extension of time until September 21, 2018 to file Preliminary Objection to Proposed Qualified Modification filed by Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc., Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc. Related document: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Response to motion due by 9/21/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/17/2018.(ct)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER GRANTING #134 MOTION for extension of time until September 21, 2018 to file Preliminary Objection to Proposed Qualified Modification filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Related document: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Response to motion due by 9/21/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/17/2018.(ct)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER GRANTING #137 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Extension of Deadline to File Objections to the Qualifying Modification filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Related document: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Insurers' Response due by 9/18/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/17/2018.(ct)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re #138 MOTION for extension of time until 9/21/2018 to file a preliminary objection to the Qualifying Modification filed by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. Related document: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Response due by 9/21/2018 at 5:00 PM (AST). NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/17/2018.(ct)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting #141 Motion for Attorney Kristin K. Going to Appear as PHV on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/17/2018. (ct)
September 14, 2018 Filing 142 NOTICE of Service for Depositions by Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. (Cumpiano, Lady)
September 14, 2018 Filing 141 Motion to allow Kristin Going to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6057901) filed by Kendra K. Loomis on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as (i) successor Indenture Trustee under the February 17, 2006 indenture and (ii) Indenture Trustee under the indenture for the 7.500% GDB Debt Recovery Au Responses due by 9/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Loomis, Kendra)
September 14, 2018 Filing 140 Corporate Disclosure Statement byWilmington Trust, National Association, as (i) successor Indenture Trustee under the February 17, 2006 indenture and (ii) Indenture Trustee under the indenture for the 7.500% GDB Debt Recovery Au identifying Corporate Parent M&T Bank Corporation for Wilmington Trust, National Association, as (i) successor Indenture Trustee under the February 17, 2006 indenture and (ii) Indenture Trustee under the indenture for the 7.500% GDB Debt Recovery Au.. (Loomis, Kendra)
September 14, 2018 Filing 139 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendra K. Loomis on behalf of Wilmington Trust, National Association, as (i) successor Indenture Trustee under the February 17, 2006 indenture and (ii) Indenture Trustee under the indenture for the 7.500% GDB Debt Recovery Authority Bonds (Taxable) due 2040 (Loomis, Kendra)
September 14, 2018 Filing 138 MOTION for extension of time until 9/21/2018 to file a preliminary objection to the Qualifying Modification filed by Julissa Reynoso on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Reynoso, Julissa)
September 14, 2018 Filing 137 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Extension of Deadline to File Objections to the Qualifying Modification filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 14, 2018 Filing 136 OBJECTION / Preliminary Objection of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of All Puerto Rico Title III Debtors (Other Than COFINA) to Proposed PROMESA Title VI Modification of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors Re: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors. (Despins, Luc)
September 14, 2018 Filing 135 MOTION for extension of time until September 21, 2018 to file Preliminary Objection to Proposed Qualified Modification filed by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc., Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc. Responses due by 9/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
September 14, 2018 Filing 134 MOTION for extension of time until September 21, 2018 to file Preliminary Objection to Proposed Qualified Modification filed by Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez on behalf of Zurich American Insurance Company Responses due by 9/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo)
September 14, 2018 Filing 133 Transcript of Omnibus Hearing held on September 13, 2018, before Honorable United States District Court Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber Amy Walker, Telephone number prcsr123@gmail.com. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 10/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2018. (aw)
September 14, 2018 Filing 132 OBJECTION to Qualifying Modification filed by Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. Re: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed by Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cumpiano, Lady)
September 13, 2018 Filing 131 REPLY to Response to Motion / Omnibus Response of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to GDB/AAFAF's and Oversight Board's Standing Objections filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors Re: #1 MOTION requesting Order filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors. (Despins, Luc)
September 13, 2018 Filing 130 NOTICE Affidavit of Service by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC re #79 Notice of Appearance, #111 Objection to, #105 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Reserving Rights to File Standing Objections as to Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, and N, #100 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Informative Motion of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Regarding September 7, 2018 GDB Procedures Motion Hearing. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
September 13, 2018 Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Omnibus Hearing held on 9/13/2018. Revised proposed order re: #125 due by 9/20/2018. (Court Reporter Amy Walker.) (ct)
September 12, 2018 Filing 128 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Revised Procedures Order and Proposed Scheduling Order Regarding the Committee's Derivative Standing Motion and Adversary Complaint filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority, The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Revised Procedures Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B- Blackline of Procedures Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. C- Proposed Scheduling Order)(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 12, 2018 Filing 127 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding / Informative Motion of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Regarding Proposed Order Approving Procedures and Setting a Schedule for Approval of the Qualifying Modification for the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico filed by Luc A. Despins on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors Responses due by 9/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B - Redline, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order, #4 Exhibit D - Redline)(Despins, Luc)
September 12, 2018 Filing 126 Transcript of Motion Hearing held on 09/07/2018, before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Court Reporter/Transcriber SD Reporters. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be available electronically to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located at www.prd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2018. (be)
September 10, 2018 Filing 125 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Approval Order by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 7, 2018 Filing 124 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Felix J. Montanez-Miranda on behalf of Bank of America Merrill Lynch Responses due by 9/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Montanez-Miranda, Felix) Modified on 9/10/2018 terminated as motion (ct).
September 7, 2018 Filing 123 Minute of Proceedings held before Judge Laura Taylor Swain: Motion Hearing held on 9/7/2018 re #4 MOTION requesting Order Approving Procedures filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Arguments heard. Revised proposed procedure order due by 9/11/2018 at 4:00 PM (AST). (Court Reporter Sam Mauro (SD Reporters).)Hearing set for 10:00.Hearing held at 10:14.Hearing ended at 11:21. (ct)
September 6, 2018 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. (Arroyo-Portela, Lourdes)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein for discovery related matters. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/06/2018.(ct)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #119 Motion for Attorney Matthew P. Kremer to Appear PHV on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/06/2018. (ct)
September 5, 2018 Filing 119 Motion to allow Mathew Kremer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6042330) filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 5, 2018 Filing 118 MOTION Submitting certified translations re: #113 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents CASE LAW AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CERTIFIED TRANSLATIONS filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority, #116 Order on Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #113 , #116 ) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER REGARDING TIME ALLOCATIONS FOR THE SEPTEMBER 7, 2018 GDB PROCEDURES MOTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/05/2018.(ct)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #113 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/5/2018. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 09/04/2018. (ct)
September 5, 2018 Filing 115 Amended INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Sep. 7, 2018 Hearing filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors Responses due by 9/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 114 REPLY to Response to Motion Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Objection to Motion for an Order Approving Procedures and Setting Schedule for Approval of Qualifying Modification for Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico in Docket No. 69 filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Re: #4 MOTION requesting Order Approving Procedures filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
September 1, 2018 Filing 113 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents CASE LAW AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE CERTIFIED TRANSLATIONS filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/17/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 1, 2018 Filing 112 OBJECTION TO THE OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS' STANDING TO OBJECT TO THE APPROVAL APPLICATION filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Re: #59 Notice (Other), filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
September 1, 2018 Filing 111 OBJECTION to Unsecured Creditors' Committee Notice of Intention to Object to Qualifying Modification for Government Development Bank filed by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Re: #59 Notice (Other), filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors filed by The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Atara Miller to Appear PHV on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/31/2018. (ct)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING #108 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Brief filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. The Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and the Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority may file a reply to the objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Docket Entry No. #69 ). Related document: #4 MOTION requesting Order Approving Procedures filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Reply due by 9/4/2018 at 11:00 AM (AST). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/31/2018.(ct)
August 31, 2018 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Brief filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Reply Brief)(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria) Modified on 8/31/2018 related document #4 (ct).
August 31, 2018 Filing 107 Motion to allow Atara Miller to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6036837) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 9/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #99 Motion for Stephen L. Ratner to Appear PHV on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/31/2018. (ct)
August 30, 2018 Filing 105 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Reserving Rights to File Standing Objections as to Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation with Respect to the Qualifying Modification for the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico. filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/31/2018 to add relationship to #15 , #21 and #22 and to delete GDB as filer. (ct).
August 30, 2018 Filing 104 OBJECTION and Reservation of Rights filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Re: #22 Notice (Other), filed by National Public Finance Guarantee Corp., #7 Order on Motion for Setting, #15 Notice (Other), filed by National Public Finance Guarantee Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp., Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corp., #14 Notice (Other) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, #8 Notice (Other) filed by United States of America filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 30, 2018 Filing 103 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding September 7, 2018 GDB Procedures Motion Hearing filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 30, 2018 Filing 102 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding September 7, 2018 Hearing filed by Lady E. Cumpiano on behalf of Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cumpiano, Lady)
August 30, 2018 Filing 101 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding September 7, 2018 GDB Procedures Motion Hearing filed by Howard R. Hawkins, Jr on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Hawkins, Howard)
August 30, 2018 Filing 100 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Informative Motion of Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Regarding September 7, 2018 GDB Procedures Motion Hearing. filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/31/2018 delete GDB as filer (ct).
August 30, 2018 Filing 99 Motion to allow Stephen L. Ratner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6033438) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/31/2018 to eliminate GDB as filer (ct).
August 30, 2018 Filing 98 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding ATTENDANCE AT THE SEPTEMBER 7, 2018 GDB PROCEDURES MOTION HEARING filed by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
August 29, 2018 Filing 97 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. (Casellas-Cabrera, Alexandra)
August 29, 2018 Filing 96 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding September 7, 2018 Hearing filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors Responses due by 9/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
August 29, 2018 Filing 95 NOTICE -- San Juan's Limited Notice of Intention to Object to the #1 Government Development Bank's Qualifying Modification and Reservation of Rights, by Autonomous Municipality of San Juan (Reynoso, Julissa) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to dkt #1 (ct).
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting #93 Motion for Dennis Dunne to Appear PHV on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/29/2018. (ct)
August 28, 2018 Filing 93 Motion to allow Dennis Dunne to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6030295) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 9/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Approving #82 STIPULATION Extending the Deadline for (I) the Municipality of San Juan to File a Notice of Intention to Object to the Qualifying Modification for the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and (II) the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority to file Standing Objections. The Notice of Intention to Object Deadline for San Juan is extended to August 29, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Atlantic Standard Time). The deadline for GDB and AAFAF to file Standing Objections with respect to San Juan is extended to September 8, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Atlantic Standard Time). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018.(mr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #56 Motion for William J. Natbony to Appear PHV on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Luc Despins to Appear PHV; granting #47 Motion for James Bliss to Appear PHV; granting #48 Motion for James Grogan to Appear PHV; granting #49 Motion for Nicholas Bassett to Appear PHV on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Howard R. Hawkins to Appear PHV; granting #40 Motion for Mark C. Ellenberg to Appear PHV; granting #41 Motion for Ellen M. Halstead to Appear PHV; granting #42 Motion for Ellen V. Holloman to Appear PHV; granting #43 Motion for Gillian Burns to Appear PHV; granting #44 Motion for Thomas J. Curtin to Appear PHV; granting #45 Motion for Casey J. Servais to Appear PHV on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr) Modified on 8/29/2018 re: font issue (ct).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Peter Friedman to Appear PHV; granting #34 Motion for Daniel Cantor to Appear PHV on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr) Modified on 8/29/2018 to correct font issue (ct).
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #50 Motion for David Neier to Appear PHV; granting #51 Motion for Julissa Reynoso to Appear PHV; granting #52 Motion for Marcelo M. Blackburn to Appear PHV; granting #53 Motion for Aldo A. Badini to Appear PHV; granting #54 Motion for Michael A. Fernandez to Appear PHV; granting #55 Motion for Ariel Flint to Appear PHV on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER granting #71 Motion for Martin J. Bienenstock to Appear PHV; granting #72 Motion for Timothy W. Mungovan to Appear PHV; granting #73 Motion for Paul Possinger to Appear PHV; granting #74 Motion for Barak Ehud to Appear PHV; granting #75 Motion for Jeffrey W. Levitan to Appear PHV; granting #76 Motion for Margaret Dale to Appear PHV; granting #77 Motion for William Dalsen to Appear PHV; granting #78 Motion for Alexandra Skellet to Appear PHV on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting #63 Motion for Robert S. Berezin to Appear PHV; granting #64 Motion for Gabriel A. Morgan to Appear PHV; granting #65 Motion for Marcia Goldstein to Appear PHV; granting #66 Motion for Jonathan D. Polkes to Appear PHV; granting #67 Motion for Kelly DiBlasi to Appear PHV; granting #68 Motion for Gregory Silbert to Appear PHV; granting #70 Motion for Jared R. Friedmann to Appear PHV on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Jared Roach to Appear PHV; granting #62 Motion for Eric Schaffer to Appear PHV on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/28/2018. (mr)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #17 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #23 Motion to Appear PHV; granting #27 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/28/2018. (ct)
August 27, 2018 Filing 82 STIPULATION Extending Deadline re Municipality of San Juan by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority, Autonomous Municipality of San Juan. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria) Modified on 8/28/2018 to add filer (ct).
August 27, 2018 Filing 81 ***FILED IN ERROR. WRONG PDF.*** STIPULATION Extending Deadline re Municipality of San Juan by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Proposed Order) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria) Modified on 8/27/2018 (ct).
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re #4 MOTION requesting Order Approving Procedures filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2018 10:00 AM (AST) in USDC-SDNY (VTC in PR) before Judge Laura Taylor Swain. INformative motion re: arguments and CourtSolutions registration due by 8/30/2018 at 12:00 PM (AST). Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/27/2018.(ct)
August 27, 2018 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 78 Motion to allow Alexandra Skellet to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026583) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 77 Motion to allow William Dalsen to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026573) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 76 Motion to allow Margaret Dale to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026562) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico . Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 75 Motion to allow Jeffrey W. Levitan. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026545) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 74 Motion to allow Barak Ehud to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026536) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 73 Motion to allow Paul Possinger to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026531) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 72 Motion to allow Timothy W. Mungovan. to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026527) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico . Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 27, 2018 Filing 71 Motion to allow Martin J. Bienenstock to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6026521) filed by Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez on behalf of The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico. Responses due by 9/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauer-Alvarez, Hermann) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct filer (mr).
August 24, 2018 Filing 70 Motion to allow Jared R. Friedmann to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 69 OBJECTION to Motion for Order filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA Re: #4 MOTION requesting Order Approving Procedures filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
August 24, 2018 Filing 68 Motion to allow Gregory Silbert to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 67 Motion to allow Kelly DiBlasi to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 66 Motion to allow Jonathan D. Polkes to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 65 Motion to allow Marcia Goldstein to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 64 Motion to allow Gabriel A. Morgan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 24, 2018 Filing 63 Motion to allow Robert S. Berezin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 23, 2018 Filing 62 Motion to allow Eric Schaffer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100049481) filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon Responses due by 9/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
August 23, 2018 Filing 61 Motion to allow Jared Roach to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6022252) filed by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon Responses due by 9/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
August 22, 2018 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Giselle Lopez-Soler on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico (Lopez-Soler, Giselle)
August 22, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE of Intention to Object Regarding Purported Qualifying Modification for Government Development Bank by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA (Casillas-Ayala, Juan) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 22, 2018 Filing 58 STIPULATION re #29 Order,,, by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Proposed Order) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 22, 2018 Filing 57 ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG PDF*** NOTICE of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Notice of Intention to Object Regarding Purported Qualifying Modification for Government Development Bank by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA (Casillas-Ayala, Juan) Modified on 8/22/2018 (mr).
August 22, 2018 Filing 56 Motion to allow William J. Natbony to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 55 Motion to allow Ariel Flint to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6018813) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 54 Motion to allow Michael A. Fernandez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6018803) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 53 Motion to allow Aldo A. Badini to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6018795) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 52 Motion to allow Marcelo M. Blackburn to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6018787) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 51 Motion to allow Julissa Reynoso to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6018783) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 50 Motion to allow David Neier to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6018767) filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 49 Motion to allow Nicholas Bassett to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100057438) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 48 Motion to allow James Grogan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100057438) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 47 Motion to allow James Bliss to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100057438) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 46 Motion to allow Luc Despins to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100057438) filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors (other than COFINA Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
August 21, 2018 Filing 45 Motion to allow Casey J. Servais to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 44 Motion to allow Thomas J. Curtin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 43 Motion to allow Gillian Burns to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 42 Motion to allow Ellen V. Holloman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 41 Motion to allow Ellen M. Halstead to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 40 Motion to allow Mark C. Ellenberg to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 39 Motion to allow Howard R. Hawkins to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
August 21, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Autonomous Municipality of San Juan (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
August 21, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Elaine Marie Maldonado-Matias on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon (Maldonado-Matias, Elaine)
August 21, 2018 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Bank of New York Mellon re #14 Notice (Other) (Santos-Mimoso, Jose)
August 21, 2018 Filing 34 Motion to allow Daniel Cantor to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number N/A) filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 21, 2018 Filing 33 Motion to allow Peter Friedman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number N/A) filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 21, 2018 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Albeniz Couret-Fuentes on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon (Couret-Fuentes, Albeniz)
August 21, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Santos-Mimoso on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon (Santos-Mimoso, Jose)
August 21, 2018 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. All attorneys appearing pro hac vice in Title VI cases must file a Pro Hac Vice Application. Those who have already been admitted in Title III cases are exempt from again paying the pro hac vice admission fee in the Title VI cases. However, attorneys not previously admitted pro hac vice in a Title III case, or in a related adversary proceeding, shall fully comply with Local Civil Rule 83(A)(f) in its entirety. By Order of the Court. Signed by Clerk on 8/17/2018. (mr)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER APPROVING #28 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR (I) CERTAIN PARTIES TO FILE NOTICES OF INTENTION TO OBJECT TO THE QUALIFYING MODIFICATION FOR THE GOVERNMENT DEVELOPMENT BANK FOR PUERTO RICO AND (II) THE GOVERNMENT DEVELOPMENTBANK FOR PUERTO RICO AND THE PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY TO FILE STANDING OBJECTIONS. The Notice of Intention to Object Deadline for (i) the GO Group, (ii) the UCC, and (iii) San Juan, is extended to August 22, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Atlantic Standard Time). The deadline for GDB and AAFAF to file Standing Objections with respect to such parties is extended to September 1, 2018 at 5:00 p.m. (Atlantic Standard Time).Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/20/2018.(mr)
August 20, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION re #7 Order on Motion for Setting Extending Deadlines for Certain Parties to File Notice of Intention to Object and the GDB and PRFAFAA to File Standing Objections by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Ad Hoc Group of General Obligation Bondholders, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A- Proposed Order) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria) Modified on 8/27/2018 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 27 Motion to allow Grant Mainland to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6016332) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 20, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez on behalf of Adsuar Muniz Goyco Seda & Perez-Ochoa, PSC (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro)
August 20, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Intention to Object to the #1 Qualifying Modification for the GDB by Adsuar Muniz Goyco Seda & Perez-Ochoa, PSC (Santiago-Martinez, Alejandro) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. re #11 Notice (Other), (Cumpiano, Lady)
August 20, 2018 Filing 23 Motion to allow Andrew Leblanc to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6016165) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 20, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE National Public Finance Guarantee Corporations Notice of Intention to Reserve Rights with Respect to the #1 Qualifying Modification for the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico by National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE National Public Finance Guarantee Corporations Notice of Intention to Object to the #1 Qualifying Modification for the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico with Respect to the Sib Funds by National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relation to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 20 Amended NOTICE of Intention to Object to #1 Qualifying Modification by Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc., Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Perez-Ochoa on behalf of National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. (Perez-Ochoa, Eric)
August 20, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Intention to Object to Qualifying Modification by Fidelity & Deposit Co. of Maryland, Zurich American Insurance Company (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 17 Motion to allow Derek Baker to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6016067) filed by Lady E. Cumpiano on behalf of Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cumpiano, Lady)
August 20, 2018 Filing 16 Motion to allow Claudia Springer to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6016033) filed by Lady E. Cumpiano on behalf of Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cumpiano, Lady)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Reservation of Rights to file a Limited Objection to the Qualifying Modification for the Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico by Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corp., Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp., National Public Finance Guarantee Corp. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLONS LIMITED NOTICE OF INTENTION TO OBJECT TO QUALIFYING MODIFICATION OF THE GOVERNMENT DEVELOPMENT BANK AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS by The Bank of New York Mellon (Santos-Mimoso, Jose) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Intention to Object to Qualifying Modification by Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc., Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc. (Fernandez-Martinez, Alfredo) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Ambac Assurance Corporation (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
August 20, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Intention to Object by Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. re #7 Order on Motion for Setting (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F, #3 Exhibit Exhibits G-H, #4 Exhibit Exhibit I-N) (Cumpiano, Lady) Modified on 8/30/2018 to add relationship to #1 (ct).
August 20, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront on behalf of Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. (Alejandro-Souffront, Tatiana)
August 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Lady E. Cumpiano on behalf of Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E. (Cumpiano, Lady)
August 20, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Intention to Object by United States of America Re: #1 Application (Troy, Matthew) Modified on 8/27/2018 (ct).
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Setting. Notice of Intention to Object due by 8/20/2018. Standing Objection due by 8/30/2018. Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 08/10/2018. (ct)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Cover Sheet and Clarifying Filing re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 8/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 10, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,, Declaration of Suzzanne Uhland by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O part 1, #16 Exhibit O part 2, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q) (Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION requesting Order Approving Procedures filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 8/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Setting Deadline for Parties to File Notice of Intention to Object to the Qualifying Modification for the GDB and Parties to File Standing Objections filed by Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez on behalf of Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority Responses due by 8/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria)
August 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain (arg)
August 10, 2018 Filing 1 APPLICATION ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6002145.), filed by Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority. Service due by 11/8/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit Uhland Declaration)(Trelles-Hernandez, Maria) Modified on 8/13/2018 to change event as per chambers' instructions. (ct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew P. Kremer
Represented By: Daniel L. Cantor
Represented By: Peter Friedman
Represented By: Giselle Lopez-Soler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Puerto Rico Fiscal Agency and Financial Advisory Authority
Represented By: Maria Dolores Trelles-Hernandez
Represented By: Matthew P. Kremer
Represented By: Daniel L. Cantor
Represented By: Peter Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: National Public Finance Guarantee Corp.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Polkes
Represented By: Jared R. Friedmann
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Kelly DiBlasi
Represented By: Gabriel A. Morgan
Represented By: Alexandra C. Casellas-Cabrera
Represented By: Robert S. Berezin
Represented By: Gregory Silbert
Represented By: Marcia Goldstein
Represented By: Lourdes Arlene Arroyo-Portela
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fundacion Sila M. Calderon, Inc.
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fundacion Biblioteca Rafael Hernandez Colon, Inc.
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of all Title III Debtors
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: James R. Bliss
Represented By: James T. Grogan, III
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Ericka Celeste Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Nicholas Bassett
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Jared S. Roach
Represented By: Eric A. Schaffer
Represented By: Elaine Marie Maldonado-Matias
Represented By: Jose J. Santos-Mimoso
Represented By: Albeniz Couret-Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Siemens Transportation Puerto Rico, S.E.
Represented By: Lady E. Cumpiano
Represented By: Claudia Z. Springer
Represented By: Derek J. Baker
Represented By: Tatiana M. Alejandro-Souffront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Fidelity & Deposit Co. of Maryland
Represented By: Alfredo Fernandez-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Jordan Troy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By: Kristin K. Going
Represented By: Kendra K. Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Assured Guaranty Corp.
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Howard R. Hawkins, Jr.
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Gillian Groarke Burns
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Ellen V. Holloman
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Panagiota Manatakis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: The Financial Oversight and Management Board for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Daniel Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Alexandra K. Skellet
Represented By: Margaret A. Dale
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Assured Guaranty Municipal Corp.
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Howard R. Hawkins, Jr.
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Gillian Groarke Burns
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Ellen V. Holloman
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ad Hoc Group of General Obligation Bondholders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bank of America Merrill Lynch
Represented By: Karol K. Denniston
Represented By: Felix J. Montanez-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Ambac Assurance Corporation
Represented By: Atara Miller
Represented By: Grant R. Mainland
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Andrew M. Leblanc
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Sonia Colon-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Autonomous Municipality of San Juan
Represented By: Julissa Reynoso
Represented By: Ariel Flint
Represented By: Aldo A. Badini
Represented By: David Neier
Represented By: Michael A. Fernandez
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Represented By: Marcelo M. Blackburn
Represented By: Carlos M. Hernandez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Adsuar Muniz Goyco Seda & Perez-Ochoa, PSC
Represented By: Alejandro A. Santiago-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?