Perez-Cordero v. Coco Beach Resort Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Tamaris Perez-Cordero
Defendant: Coco Beach Resort Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01574
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: Fajardo
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Hugo Rodriguez-Diaz on behalf of Defendant Coco Beach Resort Management, LLC.(Rodriguez-Diaz, Hugo)
August 23, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #3 Affidavit of Service.***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** (gav)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 ***FILED IN ERROR Incorrect PDF.*** AFFIDAVIT of Service by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Cobo-Estrella, Humberto) Modified on 8/23/2018 (gav).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Coco Beach Resort Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge William G. Young. New Civil Case Filing Fee received #PRX100057376 ($400.00) (ad)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tamaris Perez-Cordero. Service due by 11/13/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Right to Sue Notice, #4 Summons)(Cobo-Estrella, Humberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez-Cordero v. Coco Beach Resort Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coco Beach Resort Management, LLC
Represented By: Hugo Rodriguez-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamaris Perez-Cordero
Represented By: Humberto F. Cobo-Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?