Cruz v. University of Puerto Rico

Plaintiff: Maritza D. Cruz
Defendant: University of Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2018cv01575
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: Vega Alta
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal (Docket No. 5) entered by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, this case has been randomly reassigned within the Case Assignment System to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. Judge Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 08/23/2018.(gr)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby disqualifies himself from presiding over this matter. The Clerk shall randomly reassign this case to another U.S. district judge. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/23/2018.(gr)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits -Category Sheet Re: #1 Complaint filed by Maritza D. Cruz filed by Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis) Modified on 8/22/2018 event (gav).
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category Sheet not filled out electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/17/2018. (ad)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6010767.), filed by Maritza D. Cruz. Service due by 11/13/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bonilla-Nieves, Amexis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. University of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza D. Cruz
Represented By: Amexis J. Bonilla-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?