Noel et al v. Robinson Aviation (RVA), Inc.
Plaintiff: KELORN A SAMUEL, XIOMARA NOEL, O.L.N. and Kelorn A. Samuel
Defendant: Robinson Aviation (RVA), Inc., Insurance Companies X, Y & Z and CI2 Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01579
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Office: San Juan Office
County: San Juan
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion, WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by O.L.N., Xiomara Noel, Kelorn A. Samuel. CI2 Aviation, Inc. waiver sent on 9/12/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service executed by CI2 Aviation,Inc.) (Morales-Bauza, Carlos) Modified event on 9/21/2018 (idg).
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to CI2 Aviation, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by O.L.N., Xiomara Noel, Kelorn A. Samuel. (Attachments: #1 Summons CI2 Aviation, Inc.)(Morales-Bauza, Carlos)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Robinson Aviation (RVA), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 21, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
August 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet re: #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Carlos J. Morales-Bauza on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Related document(s) #2 ) (Morales-Bauza, Carlos)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING: Electronic signature omitted in Civil Cover Sheet. L.Civ.R. 11. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/21/2018. (ad)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robinson Aviation (RVA), Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6013860.), filed by XIOMARA NOEL, KELORN A SAMUEL. Service due by 11/15/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Robinson Aviation (RVA), Inc.)(Morales-Bauza, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noel et al v. Robinson Aviation (RVA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Aviation (RVA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies X, Y & Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CI2 Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELORN A SAMUEL
Represented By: Carlos J. Morales-Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XIOMARA NOEL
Represented By: Carlos J. Morales-Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.L.N.
Represented By: Carlos J. Morales-Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelorn A. Samuel
Represented By: Carlos J. Morales-Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?