Ortiz v. Ramirez-Torres et al
Plaintiff: Maritza Ortiz
Defendant: Delmarie Vega-Lugo, Maria Del Mar Torres-Suria, O.A.T. (O.S.S.O), Arvia Ramirez-Torres, Silvia Bula-Bula, Harry Massanet-Pastrana, Ana Lopez-Prieto and Elba L. Martinez-Torres
Debtor: Elba Martinez
Case Number: 3:2018cv01587
Filed: August 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 16 JUDGMENT. The case is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Clerk on 10/18/2018.(sr)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 MOTION for Service by Publication as to filed by Maritza Ortiz #12 MOTION for Service by Publication as to filed by Maritza Ortiz. The motions at ECF Nos. 12 and 13 are MOOT in view of Opinion and Order entered at ECF No. 14. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/15/2018.(wm)
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 OPINION AND ORDER re #1 Complaint, filed by Maritza Ortiz. The Court lacks both diversity and federal question jurisdiction. The case is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintiff may file an application to proceed in forma pauperis within ten days of the date of this order. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/15/2018.(wm)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Service by Publication as to Maria del Mar Torres-Suria by Maritza Ortiz upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Properly Served Summons Torres Suria, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order(Prieto & Massanet)) (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 10/10/2018 to edit event type(rom).
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for SERVICE by Publication as to Attorneys Lopez Prieto & Massanet filed by Maritza Ortiz. (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 10/9/2018 to edit event type (rom).
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 Summons Returned Executed by Maritza Ortiz upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Bula, OAT and ELA) (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 10/4/2018 to edit event type (rom).
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Silvia Bula-Bula, Ana Lopez-Prieto, Elba L. Martinez-Torres, Harry Massanet-Pastrana, O.A.T. (O.S.S.O), Arvia Ramirez-Torres, Maria Del Mar Torres-Suria, Delmarie Vega-Lugo (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Maritza Ortiz. Amendment to #4 Amended Complaint Correcting 2 Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amending Docket 6(OCA&ASUME)) (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE TO PAY DEBT, MALPRACTICE filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #7 Order to Show Cause, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza) Modified on 9/5/2018 to edit docket text. (rom)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to how this Court has jurisdiction over this case. And, if the Court does have jurisdiction, plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to whether and which claims are not barred by principles of res judicata. Plaintiff has ten days from the date of this order to comply. Failure to comply will result in dismissal with prejudice of plaintiff's complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 8/24/2018.(wm)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 Fourth NOTICE of Filing Exhibits ASUME AND OAT SUMMONS (Attachments: #1 ASUME) (Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
August 23, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Silvia Bula-Bula, Ana Lopez-Prieto, Elba L. Martinez-Torres, Harry Massanet-Pastrana, O.A.T. (O.S.S.O), Arvia Ramirez-Torres, Maria Del Mar Torres-Suria, Delmarie Vega-Lugo (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Amended Summons against All Defendants, filed by Maritza Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Summons Amended Per Your Request)(Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Missing information on the summons submitted. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/23/2018. (arg)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO PAY DEBT, MALPRACTICE + against Silvia Bula-Bula, Ana Lopez-Prieto, Elba Martinez, Harry Massanet-Pastrana, O.A.T. (O.S.S.O), Arvia Ramirez-Torres, Maria Del Mar Torres-Suria, Delmarie Vega-Lugo ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6018975.), filed by Maritza Ortiz. Service due by 11/20/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Ortiz-Sanchez, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Ramirez-Torres et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delmarie Vega-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Del Mar Torres-Suria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.A.T. (O.S.S.O)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvia Ramirez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Bula-Bula
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Massanet-Pastrana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Lopez-Prieto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elba L. Martinez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maritza Ortiz
Represented By: Maritza Ortiz-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Elba Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?