USA v. a.$10,175.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1409 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines. et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: f.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Tierras Nuevas Salientes Ward, Lot No. 7, in the Municipality, i.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Turabo Ward in the Mari-Olga Urbanization, Block Y, Lot No. 2, h.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Pugnado Afuera Ward, Las Granjas Sector, Lot No. 3, in the Mu, j.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Condominio Villas de Manati, Apartment G-301, in the Municipa, a.$10,175.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1409 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines., g.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Tierras Nuevas Salientes Ward, Lot No. 4, in the Municipality, d.$6,884.33 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, account ending in *2656 in the name of Carlos Velazquez-Gines, DBA Rebaja Ya Con Los Mejores Products., c.$10,165.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1450 in the name of Carlos E. Velazquez Gines., b.$10,342.69 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1418 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines. and e.$890.91 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, account ending in *5625, in the name of Carlos Velazquez-Gines.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01589
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER: Noting #9 "United States of America's Motion in Compliance and to Continue Stay of Civil Forfeiture Proceedings." Next status report due November 5, 2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/21/2018. (AM)
September 21, 2018 9 Motion In Compliance as to 8 Order on Motion to Stay, filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 8 ) (Martorani-Dale, David)
August 23, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER: Granting #4 "Motion to Stay." But the government shall file a motion informing of the status of the related criminal case every 45 days, beginning on 9/24/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/23/2018. (LMR)
August 23, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion to Restrict." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/23/2018. (LMR)
August 23, 2018 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
August 22, 2018 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 9/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Martorani-Dale, David)
August 22, 2018 4 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 9/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martorani-Dale, David)
August 22, 2018 3 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT by USA. (Martorani-Dale, David)
August 22, 2018 2 MOTION to Restrict Document United States' Motion to Restrict Unsworn Declaration filed by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of USA Responses due by 9/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martorani-Dale, David)
August 22, 2018 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against a.$10,175.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in 1409 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines., b.$10,342.69 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in 1418 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines., c.$10,165.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in 1450 in the name of Carlos E. Velazquez Gines., d.$6,884.33 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, account ending in 2656 in the name of Carlos Velazquez-Gines, DBA Rebaja Ya Con Los Mejores Products., e.$890.91 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, account ending in 5625, in the name of Carlos Velazquez-Gines., f.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Tierras Nuevas Salientes Ward, Lot No. 7, in the Municipality, g.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Tierras Nuevas Salientes Ward, Lot No. 4, in the Municipality, h.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Pugnado Afuera Ward, Las Granjas Sector, Lot No. 3, in the Mu, i.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Turabo Ward in the Mari-Olga Urbanization, Block Y, Lot No. 2, j.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Condominio Villas de Manati, Apartment G-301, in the Municipa, filed by USA. Service due by 11/20/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martorani-Dale, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. a.$10,175.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1409 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: f.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Tierras Nuevas Salientes Ward, Lot No. 7, in the Municipality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: i.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Turabo Ward in the Mari-Olga Urbanization, Block Y, Lot No. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: h.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Pugnado Afuera Ward, Las Granjas Sector, Lot No. 3, in the Mu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: j.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Condominio Villas de Manati, Apartment G-301, in the Municipa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: a.$10,175.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1409 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: g.All that lot or parcel of land, together with its building, appurtenances, improvements, fixtures, attachments and easements, located at Tierras Nuevas Salientes Ward, Lot No. 4, in the Municipality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: d.$6,884.33 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, account ending in *2656 in the name of Carlos Velazquez-Gines, DBA Rebaja Ya Con Los Mejores Products.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: c.$10,165.00 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1450 in the name of Carlos E. Velazquez Gines.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: b.$10,342.69 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, Certificate of Deposit number ending in *1418 in the name of Carlos Velazquez Gines.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: e.$890.91 in United States currency from First Bank Puerto Rico, account ending in *5625, in the name of Carlos Velazquez-Gines.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?