Guerrios-Flores et al v. S.M. Medical Services, C.S.P. et al
Plaintiff: PERSONS 1-4 and Loraine Guerrios-Flores
Defendant: Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance, COMPANIES A & B, INSURERS W & X, INSURERS Y & Z, Dr. William Soto-Aviles, Dr. Carlos Hernandez-Roman, John & Jane Doe, S.M. Medical Services, C.S.P. and Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv01594
Filed: August 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Igor Dominguez-Perez on behalf of Defendants Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance, S.M. Medical Services, C.S.P..(Dominguez-Perez, Igor)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Noting and Granting #15 "Notice of Appearance and for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint..." Dr. Carlo Hernandez-Roman shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 11/9/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/10/2018. (LMR)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Loraine Guerrios-Flores filed by Eugene F. Hestres-Velez on behalf of Carlos Hernandez-Roman Responses due by 10/23/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hestres-Velez, Eugene)
October 8, 2018 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Eduardo J. Ortiz-Declet on behalf of Defendant Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance.(Ortiz-Declet, Eduardo)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Noting and granting "Notice of Appearance and Request for Brief Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint." Appearing defendants shall answer the complaint by October 9, 2018. The "Motion for Default Entry" at Docket No. #9 is denied. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/5/2018. (EMJ)
October 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Brief Extension of Time to File Answer To Complaint by Eduardo J. Ortiz-Declet on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance (Ortiz-Declet, Eduardo)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #9 "Motion for Default Entry." Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance shall respond to this motion by 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/1/2018.(LMR)
October 1, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loraine Guerrios-Flores upon Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
October 1, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Entry Re, PRMDIC as insurer of codefendant Dr. William Soto Avils as to Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance filed by Hector Benitez-Arraiza on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
October 1, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon William Soto-Aviles served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
October 1, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Carlos Hernandez-Roman served on 9/20/2018, answer due 10/11/2018. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #5 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead." Puerto Rico Medical Defense shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 10/17/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/13/2018. (LMR)
September 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 17, 2018 to File Answer to Complaint filed by Igor Dominguez-Perez on behalf of Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Responses due by 9/25/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dominguez-Perez, Igor)
August 27, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loraine Guerrios-Flores upon Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance served on 8/27/2018, answer due 9/17/2018. (Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe, Carlos Hernandez-Roman, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance, S.M. Medical Services, C.S.P., William Soto-Aviles (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COMPANIES A & B, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe, Carlos Hernandez-Roman, INSURERS W & X, INSURERS Y & Z, John & Jane Doe, PERSONS 1-4, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance, S.M. Medical Services, C.S.P., William Soto-Aviles ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6022023.), filed by Loraine Guerrios-Flores. Service due by 11/21/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons S.M. Medical Svcs., CSP, #4 Summons Dr. Carlos Hernndez Romn, #5 Summons Dr. William Soto Avils, #6 Summons Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe, #7 Summons PR Medical Defense Insurance Co.)(Benitez-Arraiza, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrios-Flores et al v. S.M. Medical Services, C.S.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance
Represented By: Igor Dominguez-Perez
Represented By: Eduardo J. Ortiz-Declet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMPANIES A & B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSURERS W & X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSURERS Y & Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. William Soto-Aviles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Carlos Hernandez-Roman
Represented By: Eugene F. Hestres-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.M. Medical Services, C.S.P.
Represented By: Igor Dominguez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PERSONS 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loraine Guerrios-Flores
Represented By: Hector Benitez-Arraiza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?