Diocese of Ponce et al v. Gonzalez

Plaintiff: Diocese Of Ponce DIOCESE OF PONCE through its Bishop, Rubn Gonzlez, Diocese of Mayaguez DIOCESE OF MAYAGUEZ through its Bishop, Alvaro Corrada Del Ro, Diocese of Mayaguez and The Diocese of Ponce
Defendant: Marshals Office PR Miguel Gonzlez and Miguel Gonzalez
Intervenor: Yali Acevedo-Feliciano
Case Number: 3:2018cv01600
Filed: August 24, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2018 29 Featured Case ORDER: Noting #28 "Motion Submitting Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (LMR)
October 18, 2018 28 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations filed by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Certified Translation of Intervention Petitions, #2 Appendix Certified Translations of PR Court of Appeals Decisions)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
September 25, 2018 27 Featured Case ORDER: Noting #26 "Motion Submitting Certified Translations." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/25/2018. (LMR)
September 21, 2018 26 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation re: #21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause In Compliance as to All Plaintiffs filed by Miguel Gonzalez filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Miguel Gonzalez Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Certified Translation)(Related document(s) #21 ) (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
August 30, 2018 25 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/30/2018. (AM)
August 30, 2018 24 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 8/30/2018. Plaintiffs have 30 days to translate and file the certified translations of the Intervention Request before the Puerto Rico Court of Appeals and the Courts Order denying the Intervention. The Defendant has 30 days to translate and file the certified translation of the Amended Attachment Order. The parties shall file joint informative motions regarding status every 45 days beginning on October 4, 2018. (Court Reporter Donna Goree.) (cc)
August 29, 2018 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan A. Marques-Diaz on behalf of All Defendants (Marques-Diaz, Juan)
August 29, 2018 22 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/4/18 to file Certified Translation filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Miguel Gonzalez Responses due by 9/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
August 29, 2018 21 MOTION for Order to Show Cause In Compliance as to All Plaintiffs filed by Henry O. Freese-Souffront on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freese-Souffront, Henry)
August 29, 2018 20 RESPONSE to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #13 SPECIAL APPERANCE AND INFORMATIVE MOTION SUBMITTING DOCUMENTS RELATED TO THE STATE PROCEEDING filed by Yali Acevedo-Feliciano filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Resolution by Puerto Rico Court of Appeals dated April 30, 2018)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 29, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER: The parties are reminded that the Preliminary Injunction Hearing is set for tomorrow (August 30, 2018) at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/29/2018.(cc)
August 29, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER: Granting in part and Denying in part #16 "Motion for Brief Extension of Time to Show Cause as to why the Preliminary Injunction shall not be Granted." Defendant shall comply with the court's order by 5:00 p.m. today. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/29/2018. (LMR)
August 29, 2018 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina on behalf of Diocese of Mayaguez, The Diocese of Ponce (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
August 28, 2018 16 MOTION for Extension of Time until 8/30/2018 to file Motion in Compliance with Show Cause Order filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Miguel Gonzalez Responses due by 9/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
August 28, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER re: #13 "Special Appearance and Informative Motion Submitting Documents Related to the State Proceeding." As requested in the motion, the special appearance and documents submitted therewith are noted. However, not later than noontime tomorrow, plaintiff shall respond to this motion. Plaintiffs shall also be prepared to secure translations of the documents submitted in support of this motion. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/28/2018. (LMR)
August 28, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER: Noting #12 "Motion Informing Service of Process and Notification of Record." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/28/2018. (LMR)
August 28, 2018 13 SPECIAL APPERANCE AND INFORMATIVE MOTION SUBMITTING DOCUMENTS RELATED TO THE STATE PROCEEDING filed by German J. Brau-Ramirez on behalf of Yali Acevedo-Feliciano Responses due by 9/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Puerto Rico Court of Appeals filings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Puerto Rico Supreme Court filings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Puerto Rico Supreme Court Motions for Stay, #4 Exhibit 4 - US Supreme Court Motion for Stay, #5 Exhibit 5 - Attachment Order)(Brau-Ramirez, German) Modified on 8/28/2018 to correct event(mr).
August 28, 2018 12 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Compliance with Court Order filed by Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Agrait-Betancourt, Fernando)
August 28, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER: In connection with the Order entered at Docket No. 9, plaintiffs shall provide by noontime today, copy of all filings(with exhibits) and orders to the Secretary of Justice of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico or her authorized representative. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. (LMR)
August 27, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER : Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/30/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. Furthermore, Parties are instructed to provide copies of potential exhibits in a Binder and USB pen-drive to the undersigned courtroom deputy by not later than 8/29/2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/27/2018.(cc)
August 27, 2018 9 Featured Case ORDER: Denying in part #2 "Urgent Motion and Memorandum of Law in Support of Request for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary, and Permanent Injunction, Enjoining Defendant from Executing a Seizure Order Against Plaintiffs Who Were Not Party to the Underlying Suit" as to the Temporary Restraining Order. See attached. Defendant shall show cause not later than noontime on August 29, 2018, as to why the Preliminary Injunction requested should not be granted. Plaintiffs shall serve defendant with copy of all filings (including exhibits) and of this Order by noontime on August 28, 2018. Additionally, within the same time-frame, they shall provide record counsel for plaintiffs in Acevedo Feliciano v. Iglesia Catolica Apostolica y Romana et als., Civil Case No. SJ2016 CV 0131 before the Superior Court of San Juan of the Court of First Instance of Puerto Rico, with copy of the filings, exhibits and of this Order. Plaintiffs shall certify compliance by 5:00 p.m. on August 28, 2018. Preliminary Injunction hearing is hereby set for August 30, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1 before Hon. Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez. The exhibits to be used during the hearing shall be provided in hard copy to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Christina Cole by 3:00 p.m. on August 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/27/2018. (AM) Modified on 8/28/2018 as to typo (mr).
August 27, 2018 8 Summons Issued as to Miguel Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 27, 2018 7 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
August 27, 2018 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint,, filed by The Diocese of Ponce, Diocese of Mayaguez (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to the Complaint) (Agrait-Betancourt, Fernando)
August 27, 2018 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 8/28/2018. (arg)
August 24, 2018 4 MOTION Submitting MOTION SUBMITTING Exhibit C re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Diocese of Mayaguez DIOCESE OF MAYAGUEZ through its Bishop, Alvaro Corrada Del Ro, Diocese Of Ponce DIOCESE OF PONCE through its Bishop, Rubn Gonzlez filed by Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Agrait-Betancourt, Fernando)
August 24, 2018 3 MOTION Submitting SUMMONS AND REQUESTING EXPEDITED HEARING ON REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION OR ORDER IN AID JURISDICTION re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Diocese of Mayaguez DIOCESE OF MAYAGUEZ through its Bishop, Alvaro Corrada Del Ro, Diocese Of Ponce DIOCESE OF PONCE through its Bishop, Rubn Gonzlez, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Diocese of Mayaguez DIOCESE OF MAYAGUEZ through its Bishop, Alvaro Corrada Del Ro, Diocese Of Ponce DIOCESE OF PONCE through its Bishop, Rubn Gonzlez filed by Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Related document(s) #1 , #2 ) (Agrait-Betancourt, Fernando)
August 24, 2018 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order Of Seizure Dated March 27, 2018)(Agrait-Betancourt, Fernando)
August 24, 2018 1 COMPLAINT -VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6025424.), filed by Diocese Of Ponce DIOCESE OF PONCE through its Bishop, Rubn Gonzlez, Diocese of Mayaguez DIOCESE OF MAYAGUEZ through its Bishop, Alvaro Corrada Del Ro. Service due by 11/26/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Order Of Seizure Dated March 2, 2018, #2 Exhibit B Puerto Rico Court of Appeals Opinion case KCLE201800413)(Agrait-Betancourt, Fernando)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diocese of Ponce et al v. Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diocese Of Ponce DIOCESE OF PONCE through its Bishop, Rubn Gonzlez
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diocese of Mayaguez DIOCESE OF MAYAGUEZ through its Bishop, Alvaro Corrada Del Ro
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diocese of Mayaguez
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Diocese of Ponce
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshals Office PR Miguel Gonzlez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Gonzalez
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Represented By: Henry O. Freese-Souffront
Represented By: Juan A. Marques-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Yali Acevedo-Feliciano
Represented By: German J. Brau-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?