USA v. $8,720.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $8,720.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Case Number: 3:2018cv01617
Filed: August 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Warrant of Arrest In Rem Issued property as to $8,720.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest in Rem) (rim)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/15/2018. (rom)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
August 29, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Seizure filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 9/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
August 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $8,720.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY, filed by USA. Service due by 11/27/2018, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $8,720.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $8,720.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?