Torres-Burgos v. Crowley Liner Service, Inc.
Plaintiff: Miguel A Torres-Burgos
Defendant: Crowley Liner Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01625
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Certified Translatioins re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Crowley Liner Service, Inc. filed by Edgardo A. Vega-Lopez on behalf of Crowley Liner Service, Inc. Responses due by 10/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 A, #5 Exhibit 4 B, #6 Exhibit 4 C, #7 Exhibit 4 D, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6 A, #10 Exhibit 6 B, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Vega-Lopez, Edgardo)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Crowley Liner Service, Inc. (Vega-Lopez, Edgardo)
August 31, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category Sheet not filled out electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 9/1/2018. (ad)
August 31, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (ad)
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Certificate of Service filed by Edgardo A. Vega-Lopez on behalf of Crowley Liner Service, Inc. Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vega-Lopez, Edgardo)
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Raquel M. Dulzaides on behalf of Crowley Liner Service, Inc. (Dulzaides, Raquel)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 29, 2018 to File Answer The Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Notice of Removal,,, filed by Crowley Liner Service, Inc. filed by Edgardo A. Vega-Lopez on behalf of Crowley Liner Service, Inc. Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Vega-Lopez, Edgardo)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2018 to file Translations filed by Edgardo A. Vega-Lopez on behalf of Crowley Liner Service, Inc. Responses due by 9/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vega-Lopez, Edgardo)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance, San Juan Part, case number SJ2018CV-06391. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6033722), filed by Crowley Liner Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 Arbitration Award, #5 Exhibit 3 Termination Letter, #6 Exhibit 4 A Transcript of Hearing, #7 Exhibit 4 B Transcript of Hearing, #8 Exhibit 4 C Transcript of Hearing, #9 Exhibit 4 D Transcript of Hearing, #10 Exhibit 5 Release and Authorization, #11 Exhibit 6 A Collective Bargaining Agreement, #12 Exhibit 6 B Collective Bargaining Agreement, #13 Exhibit 6 C Collective Bargaining Agreement, #14 Exhibit 6 D Collective Bargaining Agreement, #15 Exhibit 7 Informative Motion, #16 Exhibit 8 Notification, #17 Exhibit 9 Notification)(Vega-Lopez, Edgardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres-Burgos v. Crowley Liner Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Liner Service, Inc.
Represented By: Edgardo A. Vega-Lopez
Represented By: Raquel M. Dulzaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A Torres-Burgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?