Gonzalez-Santiago v. Social Security

Plaintiff: Gonzalez Santiago Luisito and Luisito Gonzalez-Santiago
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01654
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Marcos E Lopez
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 25, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #10 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR as per Counsels request. Document will be re-filed.*** (mcm)
September 21, 2018 10 ***FILED IN ERROR*** NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David) Modified on 9/25/2018 (mcm).
September 19, 2018 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luisito Gonzalez-Santiago through USMS as to U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Puerto Rico on 9/13/18. (mcm)
September 7, 2018 9 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (vdm)
September 6, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez to conduct all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. All further pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil No. 18-11654(MEL). Judge Garcia-Gregory is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 09/06/2018.(gr)
September 6, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Pursuant to Plaintiff's Consent, Docket No. #6 , the case is hereby REFERRED to a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/6/2018. (MQ)
September 6, 2018 6 CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE dated 9/6/2018 by Gonzalez Santiago Luisito. (Colon-Flores, Rafael)
September 6, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Plaintiff shall inform the Court whether it consents to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings. Motion in compliance due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/6/2018. (MQ)
September 6, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The U.S. Marshals shall serve process upon Defendant accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/6/2018. (MQ)
September 6, 2018 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
September 5, 2018 2 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis dated 9/5/2018 filed by Rafael Colon-Flores on behalf of Gonzalez Santiago Luisito Responses due by 9/19/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Colon-Flores, Rafael)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT dated 9/5/2018 against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Gonzalez Santiago Luisito. Service due by 12/4/2018, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Current Address Notice)(Colon-Flores, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Santiago v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gonzalez Santiago Luisito
Represented By: Rafael Colon-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luisito Gonzalez-Santiago
Represented By: Rafael Colon-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?