Mendez-Campoamor et al v. UBS Financial Services of Puerto Rico Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor Rodriguez, Ana Maria Mendez Campoamor, Maria de los Angeles Mendez Campoamor, Maria de los Angeles Mendez-Campoamor, Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor-Rodriguez and Ana Maria Mendez-Campoamor
Defendant: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Tax Free Puerto Rico Fund II Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc. V and UBS Financial Services of Puerto Rico Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01656
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Docket No. 13 Opposition due by 11/12/2018. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/2/2018. (wm)
November 2, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 11/12/2018. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/2/2018. (wm)
November 2, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 11/2/2018. No further extensions will be granted absent exigent circumstances. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/2/2018. (wm)
November 1, 2018 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Docket No. 13 filed by Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sagardia-Abreu, Carlos)
October 30, 2018 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 12, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor-Rodriguez, Maria de los Angeles Mendez-Campoamor, Ana Maria Mendez-Campoamor filed by Mariana Muniz-Lara on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Responses due by 11/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Muniz-Lara, Mariana)
October 19, 2018 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana on behalf of Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc. V, Tax Free Puerto Rico Fund II Inc., UBS Financial Services of Puerto Rico Inc. Responses due by 11/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Casellas-Santana, Ricardo)
September 28, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Ramos-Pruetzel, Oreste)
September 27, 2018 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 1, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor-Rodriguez, Maria de los Angeles Mendez-Campoamor, Ana Maria Mendez-Campoamor filed by Mariana Muniz-Lara on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Responses due by 10/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Muniz-Lara, Mariana)
September 27, 2018 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariana Muniz-Lara on behalf of Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Muniz-Lara, Mariana)
September 24, 2018 9 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #8 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 09/24/2018.(gr)
September 24, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/24/2018.(LMR)
September 21, 2018 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor-Rodriguez, Maria de los Angeles Mendez-Campoamor, Ana Maria Mendez-Campoamor filed by Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana on behalf of Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc. V, Tax Free Puerto Rico Fund II Inc., UBS Financial Services of Puerto Rico Inc. Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Casellas-Santana, Ricardo)
September 18, 2018 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Sagardia-Abreu, Carlos)
September 10, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc., Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc. V, Tax Free Puerto Rico Fund II Inc., UBS Financial Services of Puerto Rico Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
September 10, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER: Granting #3 "Motion for Issuance of Summons." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/10/2018. (LMR)
September 10, 2018 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Sagardia-Abreu, Carlos)
September 6, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6041803.), filed by Maria de los Angeles Mendez Campoamor, Ana Maria Mendez Campoamor, Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor Rodriguez. Service due by 12/4/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 1-7, 9)(Sagardia-Abreu, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez-Campoamor et al v. UBS Financial Services of Puerto Rico Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor Rodriguez
Represented By: Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Mendez Campoamor
Represented By: Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de los Angeles Mendez Campoamor
Represented By: Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria de los Angeles Mendez-Campoamor
Represented By: Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Maria de las Nieves Campoamor-Rodriguez
Represented By: Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Maria Mendez-Campoamor
Represented By: Carlos J. Sagardia-Abreu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund IV, Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund III, Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tax Free Puerto Rico Fund II Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel
Represented By: Mariana Muniz-Lara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund II, Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Fixed Income Fund, Inc. V
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services of Puerto Rico Inc.
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?