Castellon-Mercado et al v. Caribbean American Property Insurance Co. et al

Plaintiff: John Doe and Mrs. Christianne Castellon-Mercado
Defendant: First Bank de Puerto Rico, Caribbean American Property Insurance Co. and Insurance Company ABC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01657
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Giancarlo Font-Garcia on behalf of Defendant Caribbean American Property Insurance Co..(Font-Garcia, Giancarlo)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 26, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint filed by Giancarlo Font-Garcia on behalf of Caribbean American Property Insurance Co. Responses due by 10/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Font-Garcia, Giancarlo) Modified docket text on 10/1/2018 (idg).
September 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION Submitting Serviced Summonses filed by Lemuel Torres-Rivera on behalf of Christianne Castellon-Mercado Responses due by 9/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Serviced Summonses)(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)
September 6, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Caribbean American Property Insurance Co., John Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caribbean American Property Insurance Co., John Doe, Insurance Company ABC filed by Christianne Castellon-Mercado. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel) Modified to remove restriction set inadvertently as notified by attorney Torres-Rivera on 9/7/2018 (idg).
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR - Duplicate filing as in d.e. #2 .*** COMPLAINT against Caribbean American Property Insurance Co., John Doe, First Bank de Puerto Rico ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6041860.), filed by Christianne Castellon-Mercado. Service due by 12/4/2018, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declarations Page, #2 Exhibit Policy, #3 Exhibit Letter)(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel) Modified docket text on 9/7/2018 (idg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellon-Mercado et al v. Caribbean American Property Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Christianne Castellon-Mercado
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Bank de Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean American Property Insurance Co.
Represented By: Giancarlo Font-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?