Sanes-Melendez et al v. MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Mr. Jose Antonio Sanes-Melendez and Mrs. Iris Perala-Martinez
Defendant: Jane Doe, MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company, Insurance Company XYZ, Corporation ABC and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv01659
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting as requested #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/17/2018. (LE)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mario R. Oronoz-Rodriguez on behalf of MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company (Oronoz-Rodriguez, Mario)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until November 16, 2018 filed by Carla Ferrari-Lugo on behalf of MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company Responses due by 10/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ferrari-Lugo, Carla)
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Carla Ferrari-Lugo on behalf of MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company (Ferrari-Lugo, Carla) Modified on 10/18/2018 to remove restriction.
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noted #4 Motion Submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/13/2018. (LE)
September 12, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION Submitting Served Summonses filed by Lemuel Torres-Rivera on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 9/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Summonses)(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, John Doe, MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6042291.), filed by Iris Perala-Martinez, Jose Antonio Sanes-Melendez. Service due by 12/4/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel) Modified on 9/6/2018 to remove restriction (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanes-Melendez et al v. MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPFRE/PRAICO Insurance Company
Represented By: Carla Ferrari-Lugo
Represented By: Mario R. Oronoz-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Jose Antonio Sanes-Melendez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Iris Perala-Martinez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?