Ledesma-Delgado v. Universal Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Mr. Alfredo Joel Ledesma-Delgado
Defendant: Jane Doe, Insurance Company ABC, John Doe, Corporation XYZ and Universal Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01660
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Sofia Rosado-Wojna on behalf of Defendant Universal Insurance Company.(Rosado-Wojna, Sofia)
October 4, 2018 9 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
September 28, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER: Noted #6 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting as requested #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/28/2018. (LE)
September 27, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Additional Counsel by Sofia Rosado-Wojna on behalf of Universal Insurance Company (Rosado-Wojna, Sofia)
September 27, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time until October 31, 2018 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Alfredo Joel Ledesma-Delgado filed by Juan J. Casillas-Ayala on behalf of Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 10/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Casillas-Ayala, Juan)
September 13, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER: Noted #4 Motion Submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/13/2018. (LE)
September 12, 2018 4 MOTION Submitting Served Summonses filed by Lemuel Torres-Rivera on behalf of Alfredo Joel Ledesma-Delgado Responses due by 9/26/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served Summonses)(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)
September 6, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe, John Doe, Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 6, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6042628.), filed by Alfredo Joel Ledesma-Delgado. Service due by 12/4/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit Declarations Page, #4 Exhibit Policy, #5 Exhibit Carrier Correspondence, #6 Exhibit Offer Letter, #7 Exhibit Closing Offer Letter, #8 Exhibit Damages Estimate Report, #9 Summons Universal Ins., #10 Summons Corporation XYZ, #11 Summons John and Jane Doe, #12 Summons Insurance Co. ABC)(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel) Modified on 9/6/2018 to remove restriction (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledesma-Delgado v. Universal Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Sofia Rosado-Wojna
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Alfredo Joel Ledesma-Delgado
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?