Lebron-Yero v. Lebron-Rodriguez et al

Plaintiff: Felix Albert Lebron-Yero
Defendant: Corporations A through Z, Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Lebron-Doe, John Doe, Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez, Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Lebron-Roe, John Roe, Ana Maria Rodriguez de Lebron, John Does 1, 2 and 3, Unknown Insurance Companies A through H, Conjugal Partnership Roe-Lebron, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Lebron and Ana Maria Rodriguez-de-Lebron
Case Number: 3:2018cv01665
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 24, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER re #13 Motion Requesting Order: DENIED as premature. Defendants have yet to answer the complaint. Once defendants answer the complaint, a scheduling order will issue. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/24/2018. (brc)
October 24, 2018 13 MOTION requesting Order Setting Initial Scheduling Conference (FRCP 16(b)) filed by David Efron on behalf of Felix Albert Lebron-Yero Responses due by 11/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Efron, David)
October 17, 2018 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rene J. Aviles-Garcia on behalf of Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez, Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez, Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez (Aviles-Garcia, Rene)
October 3, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Appearance is NOTED. Request for extension of time is GRANTED. Answer deadline November 8, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/03/2018. (brc)
October 3, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez, Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez, Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
October 3, 2018 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte on behalf of Ana Maria Rodriguez-de-Lebron Responses due by 10/17/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Aviles-Aponte, Gabriel)
October 3, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER re #6 Notice of Appearance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/03/2018. (brc)
October 3, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer due November 8, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/03/2018. (brc)
October 2, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez on behalf of Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez, Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez, Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez (Tulier-Vazquez, Suleicka)
October 2, 2018 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez, Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez, Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez Responses due by 10/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
September 17, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felix Albert Lebron-Yero upon Conjugal Partnership Doe-Lebron served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Conjugal Partnership Roe-Lebron served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; John Doe served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; John Roe served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018; Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018; Ana Maria Rodriguez-de-Lebron served on 9/14/2018, answer due 10/5/2018. (Efron, David)
September 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Doe-Lebron, Conjugal Partnership Roe-Lebron, John Doe, John Roe, Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez, Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez, Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez, Ana Maria Rodriguez-de-Lebron (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 10, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6046779.), filed by Felix Albert Lebron-Yero. Service due by 12/6/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Efron, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lebron-Yero v. Lebron-Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations A through Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Elena Lebron-Rodriguez
Represented By: Rene J. Aviles-Garcia
Represented By: Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Lebron-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filiberto Lebron-Rodriguez
Represented By: Rene J. Aviles-Garcia
Represented By: Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anicruz Lebron-Rodriguez
Represented By: Rene J. Aviles-Garcia
Represented By: Suleicka Tulier-Vazquez
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Lebron-Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Maria Rodriguez de Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1, 2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies A through H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Roe-Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Lebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Maria Rodriguez-de-Lebron
Represented By: Gabriel R. Aviles-Aponte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix Albert Lebron-Yero
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?