De Leon v. First Transit, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin De Leon
Defendant: First Transit, Inc., First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc. and First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01666
Filed: September 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Referring Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit, Inc. filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit, Inc. Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Marin-Catala, Natalia)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of Defendants First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit, Inc..(Marin-Catala, Natalia)
November 1, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalia Marin-Catala on behalf of All Defendants (Marin-Catala, Natalia)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 First NOTICE of Appearance by Yldefonso Lopez-Morales on behalf of First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit, Inc. (Lopez-Morales, Yldefonso)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the #5 Order of Recusal entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez, this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Carmen C. Cerezo. Judge Delgado-Hernandez is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 10/03/2018. (gr)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/3/2018. (LMR)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for extension of time until November 5, 2018, to Answer Complaint or Otherwise Plead Pursuanto to Local Civil Rule 6 filed by Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes on behalf of all defendants. Responses due by 10/17/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bayouth-Montes, Alberto) Modified docket text on 10/4/2018 (idg).
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc., First Transit, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6047241.), filed by Benjamin De Leon. Service due by 12/7/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc., #4 Summons First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc., #5 Summons First Transit, Inc.)(Duran-Rodriguez, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Leon v. First Transit, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit, Inc.
Represented By: Yldefonso Lopez-Morales
Represented By: Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes
Represented By: Natalia Marin-Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit Rail of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Yldefonso Lopez-Morales
Represented By: Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes
Represented By: Natalia Marin-Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Transit of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Yldefonso Lopez-Morales
Represented By: Alberto Jose Bayouth-Montes
Represented By: Natalia Marin-Catala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin De Leon
Represented By: Manuel Duran-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?