Gonzalez-Chacon v. Aspen American Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Alberto Gonzalez-Chacon
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company and Markel American Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01689
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Markel American Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons as to Markel American Ins. Co. re #3 Amended Complaint filed by Alberto Gonzalez-Chacon (Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
October 1, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Alberto Gonzalez-Chacon.(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aspen American Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (ad)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT In Admiralty against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6062153.), filed by Alberto Gonzalez-Chacon. Service due by 12/17/2018, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Castaner-Padro, Alberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gonzalez-Chacon v. Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Markel American Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Gonzalez-Chacon
Represented By: Alberto J. Castaner-Padro, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?