Parisi et al v. Mapfre Praico Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Albert Parisi and Sandy Parisi
Defendant: Mapfre Praico Insurance Company and Mapfre Pan American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01691
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss as to All Defendants filed by Jorge Carazo-Quetglas on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Mapfre Pan American Insurance Company, Mapfre Praico Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mapfre Pan American Insurance Company, Mapfre Praico Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6063768.), filed by Sandy Parisi, Albert Parisi. Service due by 12/18/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Carazo-Quetglas, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parisi et al v. Mapfre Praico Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapfre Praico Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapfre Pan American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Parisi
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandy Parisi
Represented By: Jorge Carazo-Quetglas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?