Berman et al v. Real Legacy Assurance, Inc.
Plaintiff: LINDA SIPERSTEIN, HORSESHOE ROAD INN, LLC, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP BERMAN-SIPERSTEIN and DOUGLAS BERMAN
Defendant: Real Legacy Assurance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01700
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Real Legacy Assurance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noting #6 "Informative Motion." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/9/2018. (LMR)
October 6, 2018 Filing 6 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of form of summons filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noting #3 "Informative Motion Regarding Civil Cover..." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/24/2018. (LMR)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of Cover Sheet and Category Sheet filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Legacy Assurance, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6066007.), filed by HORSESHOE ROAD INN, LLC, DOUGLAS BERMAN, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP BERMAN-SIPERSTEIN, LINDA SIPERSTEIN. Service due by 12/19/2018,(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berman et al v. Real Legacy Assurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA SIPERSTEIN
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HORSESHOE ROAD INN, LLC
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP BERMAN-SIPERSTEIN
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOUGLAS BERMAN
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Legacy Assurance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?