Torrado-Reyes v. Triple-S Propiedad
Plaintiff: Rafael Torrado Reyes and Rafael F. Torrado-Reyes
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad
Case Number: 3:2018cv01703
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Triple-S Propiedad. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by Rafael Torrado Reyes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet) (Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing Fee Received $ 400.00, receipt number 0104-6066154 (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Triple-S Propiedad, filed by Rafael Torrado Reyes. Service due by 12/19/2018,(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrado-Reyes v. Triple-S Propiedad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Torrado Reyes
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael F. Torrado-Reyes
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?