Vda. Monsanto et al v. Real Legacy Assurance Company Inc.
Plaintiff: Rosa M. Mendez Alicea Vda. Monsanto, Dr. Vivian Monsanto Mendez, Maria Teresa Monsanto Mendez, Virgilio Monsanto Mendez, Gladys Teresa Monsanto Tort, Maria Teresa Monsanto-Mendez, Gladys Teresa Monsanto-Tort, Virgilio Monsanto-Mendez and Dr. Vivian Monsanto-Mendez
Defendant: Real Legacy Assurance Company Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01704
Filed: September 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(rom)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Real Legacy Assurance Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint, filed by Rosa M. Mendez Alicea Vda. Monsanto, Dr. Vivian Monsanto Mendez, Gladys Teresa Monsanto Tort, Maria Teresa Monsanto Mendez, Virgilio Monsanto Mendez (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet) (Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg)
September 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Real Legacy Assurance Company Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6066242.), filed by Rosa M. Mendez Alicea Vda. Monsanto, Virgilio Monsanto Mendez, Maria Teresa Monsanto Mendez, Dr. Vivian Monsanto Mendez, Gladys Teresa Monsanto Tort. Service due by 12/19/2018,(Torres-Rivera, Lemuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vda. Monsanto et al v. Real Legacy Assurance Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa M. Mendez Alicea Vda. Monsanto
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Vivian Monsanto Mendez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Monsanto Mendez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgilio Monsanto Mendez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Teresa Monsanto Tort
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Teresa Monsanto-Mendez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Teresa Monsanto-Tort
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgilio Monsanto-Mendez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dr. Vivian Monsanto-Mendez
Represented By: Lemuel Torres-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Legacy Assurance Company Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?