USA v. One 2017 CAN-AM Maverick X3 DS Turbo, Plate Number ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: ONE 2017 CAN-AM MAVERICK X3 DS TURBO, PLATE NUMBER ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550
Case Number: 3:2018cv01726
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Carmen C Cerezo
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1341
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike Re: #8 SURReply to Reply to Opposition, filed by One 2017 CAN-AM Maverick X3 DS Turbo, Plate Number ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550 filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Stay Complaint Re: #3 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by One 2017 CAN-AM Maverick X3 DS Turbo, Plate Number ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550. (Espada-Ocasio, Jennie) Modified to edit docket text on 11/7/2018 (idg).
October 31, 2018 Filing 7 REPLY to Motion to Stay Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem filed by USA Re: #3 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by USA filed by USA. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) Modified docket text on 11/16/2018 (idg).
October 13, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by One 2017 CAN-AM Maverick X3 DS Turbo, Plate Number ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550 Re: #3 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by USA filed by One 2017 CAN-AM Maverick X3 DS Turbo, Plate Number ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550. (Espada-Ocasio, Jennie)
October 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennie M. Espada-Ocasio on behalf of One 2017 CAN-AM Maverick X3 DS Turbo, Plate Number ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550 (Espada-Ocasio, Jennie)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Seizure filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against ONE 2017 CAN-AM MAVERICK X3 DS TURBO, PLATE NUMBER ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550, filed by USA. Service due by 12/26/2018, (Attachments: #1 Unsworn Declaration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One 2017 CAN-AM Maverick X3 DS Turbo, Plate Number ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 2017 CAN-AM MAVERICK X3 DS TURBO, PLATE NUMBER ITE-268, VIN: 3JBVDAW49HK000550
Represented By: Jennie M. Espada-Ocasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?