Lopez- Hernandez v. Terumo Medical Devices Company

Plaintiff: Rosa Lopez- Hernandez
Defendant: Terumo Medical Devices Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01758
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2018 5 MOTION for Default Entry as to Terumo Medical Devices Company filed by Orlando Duran-Medero on behalf of Rosa Lopez- Hernandez Responses due by 12/18/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Exhibit 1)(Duran-Medero, Orlando)
December 4, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosa Lopez- Hernandez upon Terumo Medical Devices Company served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Duran-Medero, Orlando)
October 11, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Terumo Medical Devices Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 11, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Terumo Medical Devices Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6093450.), filed by Rosa Lopez- Hernandez. Service due by 1/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Duran-Medero, Orlando)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez- Hernandez v. Terumo Medical Devices Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terumo Medical Devices Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Lopez- Hernandez
Represented By: Orlando Duran-Medero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?