Lefranc-Pagan v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Juan L Lefranc Pagan and Juan L. Lefranc-Pagan
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01760
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
0 Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
1 Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2018 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed served 11/14/2018 by Juan L. Lefranc-Pagan upon Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/14/2018, answer due 12/5/2018. (Colon-Flores, Rafael)
November 15, 2018 8 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 7), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for Report and Recommendation, or for disposition if consent is provided. Signed by Clerk on 11/15/2018. (gr)
November 15, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge: Case is referred to a Magistrate Judge for report and recommendation or for disposition were consent to be provided. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/15/2018.(wm)
November 14, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
November 8, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 6, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of Court is to issue summons accordingly. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2018. (wm)
October 11, 2018 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
October 10, 2018 2 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis dated 10/10/2018 filed by Rafael Colon-Flores on behalf of Juan L Lefranc Pagan Responses due by 10/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Colon-Flores, Rafael)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Juan L Lefranc Pagan. Service due by 1/8/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Current Address Notice)(Colon-Flores, Rafael) Modified on 10/11/2018 to edit docket text (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lefranc-Pagan v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan L Lefranc Pagan
Represented By: Rafael Colon-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan L. Lefranc-Pagan
Represented By: Rafael Colon-Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?