Nater-Gonzalez et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Plaintiff: Sarah Otero-Nater and Rosario Nater-Gonzalez
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 3:2018cv01762
Filed: October 11, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 30, 2018 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Ernesto J. Rodriguez-Lavergne on behalf of Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Rodriguez-Lavergne, Ernesto)
November 21, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation "Motion allowed. There shall be no further continuances in this case." Answer deadline due by 12/2/2018. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 11/21/2018. (EES)
November 2, 2018 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Ernesto J. Rodriguez-Lavergne on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Responses due by 11/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-Lavergne, Ernesto)
October 17, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rosario Nater-Gonzalez, Sarah Otero-Nater upon Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 10/16/2018, answer due 11/6/2018. (Martinez-Llorens, Luis)
October 12, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Costco Wholesale Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 12, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6097713.), filed by Rosario Nater-Gonzalez, Sarah Otero-Nater. Service due by 1/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Martinez-Llorens, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nater-Gonzalez et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Otero-Nater
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosario Nater-Gonzalez
Represented By: Luis G. Martinez-Llorens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Ernesto J. Rodriguez-Lavergne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?