CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Perez-Nieves et al

Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Defendant: Marilu Nieves-Matos and Luis Manuel Perez-Nieves
Case Number: 3:2018cv01766
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER: Granting #7 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/7/2018. (AGF)
December 7, 2018 7 MOTION Submitting document filed by Enrique A. Guzman-Matos on behalf of CitiMortgage, Inc. Responses due by 12/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Statement of debt)(Guzman-Matos, Enrique)
November 5, 2018 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(gmm)
October 16, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Marilu Nieves-Matos. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim)
October 15, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to Luis Manuel Perez-Nieves. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim)
October 15, 2018 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
October 12, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement byCitiMortgage, Inc.. (Guzman-Matos, Enrique)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6099254.), filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. Service due by 1/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Text of Proposed Order Summons, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Guzman-Matos, Enrique)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CitiMortgage, Inc. v. Perez-Nieves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Enrique A. Guzman-Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilu Nieves-Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Manuel Perez-Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?