Lamberty v. Antilles Military Academy

Plaintiff: Amarylis A. Lamberty
Defendant: Antilles Military Academy
Case Number: 3:2018cv01767
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2018 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Godwin Aldarondo-Girald on behalf of Defendant Antilles Military Academy.(Aldarondo-Girald, Godwin)
October 30, 2018 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amarylis A. Lamberty upon Antilles Military Academy served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Lugo-Miranda, Anibal)
October 15, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Antilles Military Academy. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (rim)
October 15, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Amarylis A. Lamberty against Antilles Military Academy ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6099374.), filed by Amarylis A. Lamberty. Service due by 1/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Change of Address Form)(Lugo-Miranda, Anibal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamberty v. Antilles Military Academy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amarylis A. Lamberty
Represented By: Anibal Lugo-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antilles Military Academy
Represented By: Godwin Aldarondo-Girald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?