Salamo-Martinez et al v. Subway Restaurant #21043 et al

Plaintiff: Yacira Lpez-Montes, Natali Gonzlez-Lpez, Hortensia Martnez-Purcell, Jaime Gonzlez-Lpez, Estee Salamo-Martnez, Yacira Gonzlez-Lpez, Angel Salamo-Martnez, Natali Gonzalez-Lopez, Pedro Jaime Gonzalez-Lopez, Yacira Lopez-Montes, Conjugal Partnership Salamo-Lopez, Estee Camille Salamo-Martinez, Yacira Gonzalez-Lopez, Hortensia Martinez-Purcell and Angel Salamo-Martinez
Defendant: Franklin Martnez-Rodrguez, Clemente Agosto, Subway Restaurant #21043, Municipality of Toa Alta, Luis Ortiz-Cabrera, Oscar Arroyo-Ufret, John Doe, Franklin Martinez-Rodriguez, Insurance DEF and Insurance ABC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01771
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for extension of time. Defendants Municipality of Toa Alta and Mayor Clemente Agosto have until Jan. 4, 2019 to answer or otherwise plead. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/7/2018. (rom)
December 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eileen Landron-Guardiola on behalf of Clemente Agosto, Municipality of Toa Alta (Landron-Guardiola, Eileen)
December 4, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for extension of time until 01/04/2019 to answer or otherwise plead filed by Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez on behalf of Clemente Agosto, Municipality of Toa Alta Responses due by 12/18/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vera-Ramirez, Eduardo) Modified on 12/6/2018 to edit caption (rom).
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer to the complaint is due within 30 days of the date of this order. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/4/2018. (wm)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of Clemente Agosto, Municipality of Toa Alta (Rodriguez-Munoz, Luis)
November 27, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 28, 2018 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Natali Gonzalez-Lopez, Estee Camille Salamo-Martinez, Yacira Gonzalez-Lopez, Yacira Lopez-Montes, Hortensia Martinez-Purcell, Angel Salamo-Martinez, Pedro Jaime Gonzalez-Lopez filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Subway Restaurant #21043 Responses due by 12/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Laffitte, Miguel)
November 27, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Subway Restaurant #21043. Responses due by 12/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel) Modified on 11/28/2018 to edit docket text (rom).
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Clemente Agosto served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
November 19, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Municipality of Toa Alta served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Subway Restaurant #21043 served on 11/13/2018, answer due 12/4/2018. (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Clemente Agosto, Oscar Arroyo-Ufret, Franklin Martinez-Rodriguez, Municipality of Toa Alta, Luis Ortiz-Cabrera, Subway Restaurant #21043. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier) Modified on 10/30/2018 to edit event type (rom).
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits civil category sheet/ civil cover sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Natali Gonzalez-Lopez, Estee Camille Salamo-Martinez, Yacira Gonzalez-Lopez, Yacira Lopez-Montes, Hortensia Martinez-Purcell, Angel Salamo-Martinez, Pedro Jaime Gonzalez-Lopez (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6101838.), filed by Estee Salamo-Martnez, Jaime Gonzlez-Lpez, Hortensia Martnez-Purcell, Yacira Lpez-Montes, Yacira Gonzlez-Lpez, Angel Salamo-Martnez, Natali Gonzlez-Lpez. Service due by 1/13/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salamo-Martinez et al v. Subway Restaurant #21043 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yacira Lpez-Montes
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natali Gonzlez-Lpez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hortensia Martnez-Purcell
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime Gonzlez-Lpez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estee Salamo-Martnez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yacira Gonzlez-Lpez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Salamo-Martnez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natali Gonzalez-Lopez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Jaime Gonzalez-Lopez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yacira Lopez-Montes
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Salamo-Lopez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estee Camille Salamo-Martinez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yacira Gonzalez-Lopez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hortensia Martinez-Purcell
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Salamo-Martinez
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Martnez-Rodrguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clemente Agosto
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subway Restaurant #21043
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Municipality of Toa Alta
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Represented By: Eileen Landron-Guardiola
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Ortiz-Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar Arroyo-Ufret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin Martinez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?