Lahens v. AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Felix J. Lahens
Defendant: AT&T, Inc. and AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01776
Filed: October 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana on behalf of AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc., AT&T, Inc. (Casellas-Santana, Ricardo)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 12/27/2018. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 11/28/2018. (PMA)
November 27, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Felix J. Lahens filed by Jose F. Benitez-Mier on behalf of AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc., AT&T, Inc. Responses due by 12/11/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Benitez-Mier, Jose)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felix J. Lahens upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Lugo-Miranda, Anibal)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPY. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc., AT&T, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re #1 Complaint, filed by Felix J. Lahens (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Lugo-Miranda, Anibal)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATIONS WITH STAFF. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
October 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
October 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Felix J. Lahens against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6103485.), filed by Felix J. Lahens. Service due by 1/14/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 CHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM)(Lugo-Miranda, Anibal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lahens v. AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T, Inc.
Represented By: Jose F. Benitez-Mier
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Jose F. Benitez-Mier
Represented By: Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix J. Lahens
Represented By: Anibal Lugo-Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?