Encore Benefit Management, Inc. v. Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC

Plaintiff: Encore Benefit Management, Inc.
Defendant: Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01788
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint (Counterclaim) filed by Diego J. Loinaz-Martin on behalf of Counter Defendant Encore Benefit Management, Inc..(Loinaz-Martin, Diego)
November 26, 2018 Filing 22 First INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Diego J. Loinaz-Martin on behalf of Encore Benefit Management, Inc. Responses due by 12/10/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Opposition to Remand)(Loinaz-Martin, Diego)
November 20, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to #17 Cross Motion to Consolidate filed by Encore Benefit Management, Inc. filed by Encore Benefit Management, Inc.. (Loinaz-Martin, Diego) Modified on 11/28/2018 to add docket link (rom).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Phoenix Benefits Management, LLC has 20 days from the date of this order to file certified English translations. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/20/2018. (wm)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Document filed by Heidi Miranda-Broco on behalf of Encore Benefit Management, Inc. Responses due by 11/27/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Miranda-Broco, Heidi)
November 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents Included with Docket 17 filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
November 6, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion TO ENCORE BENEFIT MANAGEMENT MOTION TO REMAND, AND DEFENDANT PHOENIX BENEFIT MANAGEMENT CROSS-MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE filed by Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Re: #11 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State CourtSan Juan Part filed by Encore Benefit Management, Inc. filed by Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Mariani-Franco, Raul)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Encore Benefit Management Inc. RESPONSE in Opposition to Defendant Phoenix Beneit Management, LLC MOTION to Dismiss filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (English Translations), #2 Exhibit A (Original Spanish Language Documents, #3 Exhibit B)(Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 11/7/2018 to edit docket text (rom).
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Encore Benefit Management, Inc. filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Plaintiff Encore Benefit Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Mariani-Franco, Raul)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER noted #12 Motion submitting. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/1/2018. (wm)
October 30, 2018 Filing 13 OBJECTION to Defendant's Phoenix Benefit Management, LLCs Motion to Dismiss filed by Encore Benefit Management, Inc. filed by Encore Benefit Management, Inc.. (Miranda-Broco, Heidi)
October 30, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Tendering English Translations re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Responses due by 11/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 26, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State CourtSan Juan Part filed by Diego J. Loinaz-Martin on behalf of Encore Benefit Management, Inc. Responses due by 11/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Loinaz-Martin, Diego)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Phoenix benefits Management, LLC, has until 11/6/2018, to file its answer. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Answer deadline due by 11/6/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/26/2018. (wm)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC's #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Responses due by 11/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mariani-Franco, Raul) Modified on 10/29/2018 to edit event type(rom).
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P.12(B)(5), or in the Alternative, to Quash Service and order Service in Compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P.4 as to Encore Benefit Management, Inc. filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Responses due by 11/9/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 6, 2018 to File Answer filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Responses due by 11/6/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #2 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents. Plaintiff is Granted until 11/30/2018 to submit certified translations. No document in Spanish will be considered unless duly translated. Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 11/30/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/19/2018. (wm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Encore Benefit Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Raul S. Mariani-Franco on behalf of Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC Responses due by 11/1/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mariani-Franco, Raul)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from First Instance of San Juan, case number SJ2018CV07069. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6107496), filed by Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mariani-Franco, Raul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Encore Benefit Management, Inc. v. Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Encore Benefit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Miranda-Broco
Represented By: Diego J. Loinaz-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Benefit Management, LLC
Represented By: Raul S. Mariani-Franco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?