Maldonado-Arce v. Claro Telephone Company

Plaintiff: Edgardo Maldonado-Arce
Defendant: Claro Telephone Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv01792
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
0 Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
1 Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Attorney Tomas A. Roman-Santos appointed for Edgardo Maldonado-Arce. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice in the Spanish Language) (gmm)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Clerk of Court shall appoint counsel forthwith. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 11/27/2018. (mcv)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll on 11/27/2018. (mcv)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 6), the #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed IFP, and the #3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel have been referred to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2018. (gr)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll: #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel filed by Edgardo Maldonado-Arce, and #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edgardo Maldonado-Arce. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/27/2018. (LE)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY.(gmm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 **SELECTED PARTY** FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Edgardo Maldonado-Arce, pro se. (gmm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Edgardo Maldonado-Arce, pro se. Responses due by 11/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Claro Telephone Company filed by Edgardo Maldonado-Arce, pro se. Service due by 1/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit) (gmm)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Edgardo Maldonado-Arce, pro se. Responses due by 11/2/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (gmm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado-Arce v. Claro Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claro Telephone Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edgardo Maldonado-Arce
Represented By: Tomas A. Roman-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?