Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America et al v. Vazquez-Colon et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership existing between Alberto Vzquez Coln and Hilda Pieiro Cceres, Miguel Bermudez-Carmona, Puerto Rico Aqueducts and Sewer Authority, Aluma Construction Corporation, Conjugal Partnership existing between Carlos Gonzlez Torres and Ivette Gomez Diaz, Carlos Gonzalez-Torres, Inter-Island Ferry System Corporation, Vieques Concrete Mix Corporatin, Vieques F.O. &G Inc., Hilda Pieiro-Caceres, Ivette Gomez-Daz, Alberto Vazquez-Colon, Conjugal Partnership existing between Gonzalez-Gomez, Conjugal Partnership existing between Vazquez -Pineiro, Ivette Gomez-Diaz and Hilda Pineiro-Caceres
Case Number: 3:2018cv01795
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting as requested #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/19/2018. (LE)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time until January 4, 2019 to to file responsive pleading filed by Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente on behalf of Aluma Construction Corporation, Miguel Bermudez-Carmona, Conjugal Partnership existing between Gonzalez-Gomez, Conjugal Partnership existing between Vazquez -Pineiro, Ivette Gomez-Diaz, Carlos Gonzalez-Torres, Hilda Pineiro-Caceres, Alberto Vazquez-Colon, Vieques F.O. &G Inc. Responses due by 1/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Valiente, Rafael)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Denying without prejudice #8 Motion for Entry of Default. Motion may be renewed within 20 days. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/3/2018. (LE)
December 3, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Default Entry as to Aluma Construction Corporation, Conjugal Partnership existing between Vazquez -Pineiro, Inter-Island Ferry System Corporation, Hilda Pineiro-Caceres, Alberto Vazquez-Colon, Vieques Concrete Mix Corporatin, Vieques F.O. &G Inc. filed by Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/17/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Steffens-Guzman, Carlos)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear ; granting as requested #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/26/2018. (LE)
November 23, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear on Behalf of PRASA, MOTION for extension of time until December 24, 2018 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Ricardo Burgos-Vargas on behalf of Puerto Rico Aqueducts and Sewer Authority Responses due by 12/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Burgos-Vargas, Ricardo)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noted #4 Informative Motion. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/20/2018. (LE)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding service of process filed by Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - 1: Executed Summons)(Steffens-Guzman, Carlos)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aluma Construction Corporation, Miguel Bermudez-Carmona, Conjugal Partnership existing between Carlos Gonzlez Torres and Ivette Gomez Diaz, Conjugal Partnership existing between Alberto Vzquez Coln and Hilda Pieiro Cceres, Ivette Gomez-Daz, Carlos Gonzalez-Torres, Inter-Island Ferry System Corporation, Hilda Pieiro-Caceres, Puerto Rico Aqueducts and Sewer Authority, Alberto Vazquez-Colon, Vieques Concrete Mix Corporatin, Vieques F.O. &G Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aluma Construction Corporation, Miguel Bermudez-Carmona, Conjugal Partnership existing between Carlos Gonzlez Torres and Ivette Gomez Diaz, Conjugal Partnership existing between Alberto Vzquez Coln and Hilda Pieiro Cceres, Carlos Gonzalez-Torres, Inter-Island Ferry System Corporation, Hilda Pieiro-Caceres, Puerto Rico Aqueducts and Sewer Authority, Alberto Vazquez-Colon, Vieques Concrete Mix Corporatin, Vieques F.O. &G Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0104-6111631, filed by Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. Service due by 1/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons)(Steffens-Guzman, Carlos) Modified on 10/22/2018 to add filing fee (xi).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America et al v. Vazquez-Colon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership existing between Alberto Vzquez Coln and Hilda Pieiro Cceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miguel Bermudez-Carmona
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Aqueducts and Sewer Authority
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aluma Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership existing between Carlos Gonzlez Torres and Ivette Gomez Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Gonzalez-Torres
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Island Ferry System Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vieques Concrete Mix Corporatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vieques F.O. &G Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Pieiro-Caceres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivette Gomez-Daz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Vazquez-Colon
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership existing between Gonzalez-Gomez
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership existing between Vazquez -Pineiro
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivette Gomez-Diaz
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Pineiro-Caceres
Represented By: Rafael A. Gonzalez-Valiente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Represented By: Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?