Municipality of Cabo Rojo v. Powersecure, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Municipio de Cabo Rojo and Municipality of Cabo Rojo
Defendant: Powersecure, Inc, Thompson Consulting Services, LLC and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2018cv01797
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #12 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Powersecure, Inc. No later than January 22, 2019, the defendant shall provide the Court with official or certified translations of all cases it cites which have been decided by the Supreme Court of Puerto Rico. See, 48 U.S.C. sec. 864 ("All pleadings and proceedings in the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico shall be conducted in the English language."); see also, Puerto Ricans for Puerto Rico Party v. Dalmau, 544 F.2d 58, 67 (1st Cir. 2008) ("Defendants, as the moving parties, had the obligation to provide the district court with a certified English translation of the Puerto Rico Supreme Court decision... on which they relied... in their motion to dismiss"). Translations due 01/22/2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/21/18.(ab)
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to Powersecure, Inc filed by Alana M. Vizcarrondo-Santana on behalf of Powersecure, Inc Responses due by 1/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vizcarrondo-Santana, Alana)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer to complaint deadline December 22, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/21/2018. (brc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 22, 2018 to File Answer Or Otherwise Plead (Stipulated) re: #1 Complaint, filed by Municipality of Cabo Rojo filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of Thompson Consulting Services, LLC Responses due by 12/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Saavedra-Castro, Juan)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer to complaint deadline December 21, 2018. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/20/2018. (brc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Municipality of Cabo Rojo filed by Alana M. Vizcarrondo-Santana on behalf of Powersecure, Inc Responses due by 12/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Vizcarrondo-Santana, Alana)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Alana M. Vizcarrondo-Santana on behalf of Powersecure, Inc (Vizcarrondo-Santana, Alana)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Municipality of Cabo Rojo upon Thompson Consulting Services, LLC served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Municipality of Cabo Rojo upon Powersecure, Inc served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
October 24, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge Martinez-Luciano on behalf of Municipio de Cabo Rojo (Martinez-Luciano, Jorge)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Powersecure, Inc, Thompson Consulting Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6112748.), filed by Municipio de Cabo Rojo. Service due by 1/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Powersecure, Inc., #4 Summons Thompson Consulting Services, LLC)(Rodriguez-Escudero, Emil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Municipality of Cabo Rojo v. Powersecure, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powersecure, Inc
Represented By: Alana M. Vizcarrondo-Santana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson Consulting Services, LLC
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Municipio de Cabo Rojo
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Municipality of Cabo Rojo
Represented By: Emil J. Rodriguez-Escudero
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?