PUMA SE v Matias-Cruz et al

Plaintiff: PUMA SE
Defendant: Jennifer Matias Cruz, TENNIS Y ALGO MAS BY JENNY;, John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Matias, Jennifer Matias-Cruz and Orlando Vazquez-Ocasio
Case Number: 3:2018cv01801
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 17 Motion In Compliance filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of PUMA SE Responses due by 1/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
December 11, 2018 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Matias, Orlando Vazquez-Ocasio. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Motion in Compliance: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/07/2018. (brc)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #12 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED in part. The Clerk will issue the summons forthwith. The preliminary injunction hearing scheduled for December 17, 2018 is VACATED. A new date for the preliminary injunction hearing will be set once the new defendants are served with process. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/07/2018. (brc)
December 6, 2018 Filing 13 Motion In Compliance as to 10 Order on Motion requesting Order filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of PUMA SE Responses due by 12/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 10 ) (Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION requesting Order for Continuance of Preliminary Injunction Hearing, to Amend Complaint to Substitute Unknown Defendants and Requesting Issuance of Summons filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of PUMA SE Responses due by 12/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 Summons by Publication as to Jennifer Matias-Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Summons by Publication) (ad)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #8 Motion Requesting Order: GRANTED. Process shall be served by publication on defendant Jennifer Matias-Cruz. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/20/2018. (brc)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification), filed by PUMA SE.(Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION requesting Order for issuance of summons by publication filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of PUMA SE Responses due by 11/30/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED. Preliminary Injunction Hearing reset for 12/17/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/7/2018. (grf)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until November 19th, 2018 to serve defendant filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of PUMA SE Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Statement)(Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Plaintiff will serve process on defendant no later than November 5, 2018. Defendant will answer the complaint and respond to plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction no later than November 20, 2018. Preliminary Injunction Hearing will be held on December 11, 2018 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/25/2018. (brc)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jennifer Matias Cruz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin on behalf of PUMA SE Responses due by 11/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6116404.), filed by PUMA SE. Service due by 1/22/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Category Sheet, #28 Civil Cover Sheet, #29 Summons)(Pamias-Portalatin, Samuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PUMA SE v Matias-Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Matias Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TENNIS Y ALGO MAS BY JENNY;
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Vazquez-Matias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Matias-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orlando Vazquez-Ocasio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUMA SE
Represented By: Samuel F. Pamias-Portalatin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?