Rodriguez-Ruiz v. Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Luis Noel Rodriguez-Ruiz
Defendant: Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01806
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl E. Schuster on behalf of All Defendants (Schuster, Carl)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Maria Elisa Echenique-Arana on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C..(Echenique-Arana, Maria)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Luis Noel Rodriguez-Ruiz. Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C. waiver sent on 10/31/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Nigaglioni, Ruben)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 29, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6119750.), filed by Luis Noel Rodriguez-Ruiz. Service due by 1/24/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Microsoft)(Nigaglioni, Ruben)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Ruiz v. Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Operations Puerto Rico, L.L.C.
Represented By: Maria Elisa Echenique-Arana
Represented By: Carl E. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Noel Rodriguez-Ruiz
Represented By: Ruben T. Nigaglioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?