Flores-Plaza v. Pabon-Ocasio et al

Plaintiff: Juan Flores-Plaza
Defendant: Juan Paris, Pamotran Films, Corp., Eduardo Ortiz and Jorge A. Pabon-Ocasio
Case Number: 3:2018cv01809
Filed: October 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint filed by Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle on behalf of Eduardo Ortiz, Jorge A. Pabon-Ocasio, Pamotran Films, Corp., Juan Paris Responses due by 12/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sueiro-Del-Valle, Roberto)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle on behalf of Eduardo Ortiz, Jorge A. Pabon-Ocasio, Pamotran Films, Corp., Juan Paris (Sueiro-Del-Valle, Roberto)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Eduardo Ortiz, Jorge A. Pabon-Ocasio, Pamotran Films, Corp., Juan Paris (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
October 30, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Category Sheet re: #1 Complaint, filed by Juan Flores-Plaza, #2 Notice of Defective Filing filed by Fredeswin Perez-Caballero on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/13/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 , #2 ) (Perez-Caballero, Fredeswin)
October 30, 2018 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category Sheet not filled out electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/31/2018. (ad)
October 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6122386.), filed by Juan Flores-Plaza. Service due by 1/28/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons Pabon, #4 Summons Summons Pamotran, #5 Summons Summons Paris, #6 Summons Summons Ortiz)(Perez-Caballero, Fredeswin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores-Plaza v. Pabon-Ocasio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Paris
Represented By: Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamotran Films, Corp.
Represented By: Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Ortiz
Represented By: Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge A. Pabon-Ocasio
Represented By: Roberto Sueiro-Del-Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Flores-Plaza
Represented By: Fredeswin Perez-Caballero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?