Revere High Yield Fund, LP v. Hegon Corporation et al

Plaintiff: REVERE HIGH YIELD FUND, LP
Defendant: EFRON DORADO, S.E., DAVID EFRON and HEGON CORPORATION
Case Number: 3:2018cv01812
Filed: October 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File. Due to the Holiday Season, defendants are to respond to Motion at Dkt. No. #9 by January 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/14/2018. (EA)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Document Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Show Cause filed by David Efron on behalf of David Efron Responses due by 12/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Efron, David)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by All Plaintiffs Re: 8 Order to Show Cause,, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (First Amended Complaint filed in Florida State Court))(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiffs are ordered to show cause as to the reasons why the instant action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction as there is an allegation of lack of indispensable party that would destroy diversity jurisdiction before this Court, and a similar action is currently pending before the Miami-Dade County Circuit Court and set for trial in February 2019. Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/26/2018. (EA)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER noted #6 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/26/2018. (EA)
November 21, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION requesting Order to Hold in Abeyance Preliminary Injunction filed by David Efron on behalf of David Efron Responses due by 12/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Efron, David)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. As "[t]he court may issue a preliminary injunction only on notice to the adverse party" and plaintiffs have failed to submit evidence of proper notification to the defendants of said motion, the Court DENIES plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Fed.R.Civ.P. 65(a)(1). Plaintiffs may resubmit the instant request upon proper compliance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/20/2018. (EA)
November 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Proposed Form of Order On Motion For Preliminary Injunctive Relief))(Saavedra-Castro, Juan)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to David Efron, Efron Dorado, S.E., Hegon Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 11/1/2018 edit text (gav).
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
October 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6124903.), filed by Revere High Yield Fund, LP. Service due by 1/28/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons David Efron, #4 Summons Efron Dorado, S.E., #5 Summons Hegon Corporation)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan) Modified on 11/1/2018 edit text (gav).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Revere High Yield Fund, LP v. Hegon Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EFRON DORADO, S.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID EFRON
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEGON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REVERE HIGH YIELD FUND, LP
Represented By: Juan H. Saavedra-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?