United States of America v. Tallaboa Transport Inc.
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Tallaboa Transport Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01817
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 30 U.S.C. ยง 0801
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 USM Return of Summons and Complaint Unexecuted as to Tallaboa Transport Inc., through its president Rosa I. Quintana on 12/7/2018. (rom)
December 21, 2018 Filing 8 USM Return of Summons and Complaint Unexecuted as to Tallaboa Transport Inc. on 12/7/2018. (rom)
December 12, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/11/2018.(wm)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion requesting Order. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/11/2018. (wm)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elias L. Fernandez-Perez on behalf of Tallaboa Transport Inc. (Fernandez-Perez, Elias)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 Joint MOTION requesting Order - Consent Judgment filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of United States of America and Tallaboa Transport Inc. Responses due by 12/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza) Modified on 12/10/2018 to add filers (rom).
November 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Tallaboa Transport Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tallaboa Transport Inc., filed by United States. Service due by 1/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Assessment and Statement Account, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Contest Rights, #3 Exhibit C- Certificate of Indebtness, #4 Exhibit D- Narrative Findings, #5 Exhibit E-Notice of Contest Rights, #6 Exhibit F- Certificate of Indebtness, #7 Category Sheet, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Tallaboa Transport Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallaboa Transport Inc.
Represented By: Elias L. Fernandez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?