Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC v. MedShape, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC
Defendant: MedShape, Inc., First Choice Prosthetic, Corp., First Choice Prosthetic & Orthopedic Service, Inc. and Insurance Companies A, B, & C
Case Number: 3:2018cv01818
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion for Remand filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC . (Lopez-Negron, Jennifer) Modified on 12/28/2018 to correct docket relationship (mcm).
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to File; granting #28 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/26/2018. (MET)
December 21, 2018 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by MedShape, Inc. Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by MedShape, Inc. filed by MedShape, Inc.. (Freese-Souffront, Henry)
December 19, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Opposition to Motion for Remand, MOTION for extension of time until December 27, 2018 to file Reply filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 1/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Granting as requested #26 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/18/2018. (LE)
December 17, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply to Docket 24 filed by Henry O. Freese-Souffront on behalf of MedShape, Inc. Responses due by 12/31/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Freese-Souffront, Henry)
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by MedShape, Inc. Re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by MedShape, Inc.. (Freese-Souffront, Henry)
December 14, 2018 Filing 24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Re: #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by MedShape, Inc. filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC. (Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION Submitting Service of summons filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 12/28/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Lopez-Negron, Jennifer) Modified on 12/17/2018 to correct event type and title (gmm).
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Granting #20 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/11/2018. (AGF)
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 Summons by Publication issued as to First Choice Prosthetic & Orthopedic Service, Inc., First Choice Prosthetic, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Summons By publication) (vdm)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Clarify Order, MOTION Submitting Proposed Order and Summons re: #16 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC, 18 Order on Motion for Issuance of Summons, #17 MOTION Submitting Exhibits re: #16 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC, 19 Order on Motion Submitting filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 12/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Summons Summons by Publication)(Related document(s) #16 , 18 , #17 , 19 ) (Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Noted #17 Motion Submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/10/2018. (LE)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting #16 Motion for Issuance of Summons. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/10/2018. (LE)
December 8, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION Submitting Exhibits re: #16 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 12/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sworn Statement Humberto Melendez, #2 Exhibit Registry of Corporations FCP, #3 Exhibit Registry of Corporations FCPOS)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
December 7, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 12/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Noted #14 Motion to clarify. Order granted only the December 14, 2018, extension. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/6/2018. (LE)
December 6, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Clarify Order filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 12/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting as requested #12 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/3/2018. (LE)
November 30, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for extension of time until December 14, 2018 to file Objection and/or Opposition to Medshape's Motion to Dismiss filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 12/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
November 30, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jennifer Lopez-Negron on behalf of Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC Responses due by 12/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sworn Statement, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registry of Corporations FCP, #3 Exhibit 3 - Registry of Corporations FCPOS)(Lopez-Negron, Jennifer)
November 19, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted and Insufficiency of Service of Process filed by Henry O. Freese-Souffront on behalf of MedShape, Inc. Responses due by 12/3/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certified Translation of Plaintiff's Motion to Serve Process, #2 Exhibit B-Certified Translation of Puerto Rico Rules of Civil Procedure. 4.6 & 10.1, #3 Exhibit C-Certified Translation of Merchan Aguilar v. Portilla Anasagasti)(Freese-Souffront, Henry)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time until November 19, 2018, to Plead or Otherwise Defend filed by MedShape, Inc. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/7/2018.(LE)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noted #3 Informative Motion regarding Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1446(d) filed by MedShape, Inc. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/7/2018. (LE)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noted #2 Motion Submitting Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by MedShape, Inc. filed by MedShape, Inc. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/7/2018. (LE)
November 5, 2018 Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time until November 19, 2018 to Plead or Otherwise Defend filed by Henry O. Freese-Souffront on behalf of MedShape, Inc. Responses due by 11/16/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Freese-Souffront, Henry)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Compliance with 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1446(d) filed by Henry O. Freese-Souffront on behalf of MedShape, Inc. Responses due by 11/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Freese-Souffront, Henry)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION Submitting Civil Cover Sheet and Category Sheet re: #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by MedShape, Inc. filed by Henry O. Freese-Souffront on behalf of MedShape, Inc. Responses due by 11/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Freese-Souffront, Henry)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of First Instance of the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Trujillo Alto Superior Part, case number TJ2018CV00421. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6127854), filed by MedShape, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit A to Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit B to Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal, #7 Exhibit A to Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit B to Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit C to Exhibit 4)(Freese-Souffront, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC v. MedShape, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caribbean Orthopedics Products of Puerto Rico, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Lopez-Negron
Represented By: Juan M. Casellas-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MedShape, Inc.
Represented By: Henry O. Freese-Souffront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Prosthetic, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Prosthetic & Orthopedic Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies A, B, & C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?