Sally Beauty Supply LLC v. Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. d/b/a All Ways 99 et al

Plaintiff: Sally Beauty Supply LLC
Defendant: Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. d/b/a All Ways 99, Corporation B, Corporation C, Insurance Company A and Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01844
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sally Beauty Supply LLC upon Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear PHV re: Mr. Peyton Healey. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 12/21/2018. (JAM)
December 21, 2018 3 Motion to allow Peyton Healy to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX0104-6179941) filed by Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes on behalf of Sally Beauty Supply LLC Responses due by 1/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)
November 7, 2018 2 Summons Issued as to Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. d/b/a All Ways 99, Corporation B, Corporation C, Insurance Company A (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (ad)
November 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. d/b/a All Ways 99, Corporation B, Corporation C, Insurance Company A ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6136227.), filed by Sally Beauty Supply LLC. Service due by 2/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. d/b/a All Ways 99, #4 Summons Insurance Company A, #5 Summons Corporation B, #6 Summons Corporation C)(Camara-Fuertes, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sally Beauty Supply LLC v. Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. d/b/a All Ways 99 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc. d/b/a All Ways 99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporation C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean Retail Ventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sally Beauty Supply LLC
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Peyton Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?