Rivera-Riva v. Allied Waste of Puerto Rico Inc.

Plaintiff: Eva Rivera-Riva
Defendant: Allied Waste of Puerto Rico Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv01845
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/20/2018. (nat)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/24/2019 to File Answer to Complaint or Otherwise Defend filed by Raquel M. Dulzaides on behalf of Allied Waste of Puerto Rico Inc. Responses due by 1/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dulzaides, Raquel)
November 7, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allied Waste of Puerto Rico Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
November 7, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to U.S. District Judge Francisco A. Besosa (ad)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting signed civil cover sheet filed by Pedro R. Vazquez, III on behalf of Eva Rivera-Riva Responses due by 11/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vazquez, III, Pedro)
November 7, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Pedro R. Vazquez, III on behalf of Eva Rivera-Riva (Vazquez, III, Pedro)
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Waste of Puerto Rico Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6136246.), filed by Eva Rivera-Riva. Service due by 2/4/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Quetglas, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Riva v. Allied Waste of Puerto Rico Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Waste of Puerto Rico Inc.
Represented By: Raquel M. Dulzaides
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Rivera-Riva
Represented By: Jose F. Quetglas
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?