Maldonado v. of Social Security

Plaintiff: Tomas Maldonado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2018cv01848
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: Puerto Rico District Court
Presiding Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:206
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2018 9 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tomas Maldonado upon Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/29/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. (Serrano-Serrano, Anderson)
November 29, 2018 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Martorani-Dale, David)
November 28, 2018 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (Docket No. 6), this case has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan for all further proceedings, including the entry of judgment. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 18-1848(BJM). Judge Garcia-Gregory is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 11/28/2018. (gr)
November 28, 2018 6 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Pursuant to Plaintiff's Consent, Docket No. #5 , the case is hereby REFERRED TO a Magistrate Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/28/2018. (MQ)
November 28, 2018 5 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Tomas Maldonado. (Serrano-Serrano, Anderson)
November 13, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER. The Commissioner of Social Security has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge in all cases involving judicial review of a final order denying disability benefits under the Social Security Act. Plaintiff shall inform whether he likewise consents, as per 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Given the undersigned's congested criminal docket, consenting will expedite the resolution of this case, and will not preclude any further judicial review by the U.S. Court of Appeals, if necessary. Plaintiff's Response due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/13/2018. (MQ)
November 9, 2018 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 9, 2018 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
November 8, 2018 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT Tomas Maldonado against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6139842.), filed by Tomas Maldonado. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Supplement, #5 Appendix)(Serrano-Serrano, Anderson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Maldonado
Represented By: Anderson Serrano-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?