Rivera-Cappacetti v. Quiles et al
Plaintiff: Lillian R. Rivera-Cappacetti
Defendant: HUD (U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development), Programa Home, Technology Management Corp., Equity Mortgage, Pedro Quiles and HUD
Case Number: 3:2018cv01860
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to HUD, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of HUD Responses due by 12/24/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Derya Samadi, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Olga De La Rosa)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
November 28, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSLATIONS by HUD re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Translations (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Certified English translations due by 12/13/2018. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/14/2018. (EA)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Responsive pleading due by 1/14/2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/14/2018. (EA)
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. (arg)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Translations filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of HUD (U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development) Responses due by 11/27/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Hector Ramirez-Carbo on behalf of HUD (U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development) Responses due by 11/27/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (), filed by HUD (U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development). (Attachments: #1 DACO Complaint, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramirez-Carbo, Hector)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Cappacetti v. Quiles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUD (U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development)
Represented By: Hector Ramirez-Carbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Programa Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology Management Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Mortgage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Quiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUD
Represented By: Hector Ramirez-Carbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian R. Rivera-Cappacetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?